EP3964745 - COMPOSITE GAS STORAGE TANK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.10.2023 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.10.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.06.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PT, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rolls-Royce plc Kings Place, 90 York Way London N1 9FX / GB | [2023/48] |
Former [2022/10] | For all designated states Rolls-Royce plc Kings Place 90 York Way London N1 9FX / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lambourne, Alexis Derby, DE24 8BJ / GB | [2022/10] | Representative(s) | Rolls-Royce plc Moor Lane (ML-9) PO Box 31 Derby DE24 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/10] | Rolls-Royce plc Intellectual Property Dept SinA-48 PO Box 31 Derby DE24 8BJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 21189874.7 | 05.08.2021 | [2022/10] | Priority number, date | GB20200013851 | 03.09.2020 Original published format: GB 202013851 | [2022/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3964745 | Date: | 09.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3964745 | Date: | 29.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F17C13/04 | [2022/10] | CPC: |
F17C13/04 (EP);
F17C1/16 (US);
F17C2201/0109 (EP,US);
F17C2201/056 (EP);
F17C2201/058 (EP);
F17C2203/0604 (EP,US);
F17C2203/0614 (EP);
F17C2203/0619 (US);
F17C2203/0658 (EP);
F17C2203/066 (EP,US);
F17C2203/0663 (EP,US);
F17C2203/0673 (EP);
F17C2205/0302 (EP);
F17C2205/0305 (EP);
F17C2221/012 (EP,US);
F17C2223/0123 (EP);
F17C2223/036 (US);
F17C2270/0168 (EP);
F17C2270/0173 (EP);
F17C2270/0178 (EP);
F17C2270/0184 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/28] |
Former [2022/10] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENGESETZTER GASSPEICHERTANK | [2022/10] | English: | COMPOSITE GAS STORAGE TANK | [2022/10] | French: | RÉSERVOIR DE STOCKAGE DE GAZ COMPOSITE | [2022/10] | Examination procedure | 08.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/28] | 08.06.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 20.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.11.2023 | CZ | 29.11.2023 | DK | 29.11.2023 | EE | 29.11.2023 | ES | 29.11.2023 | HR | 29.11.2023 | IT | 29.11.2023 | LT | 29.11.2023 | LV | 29.11.2023 | NL | 29.11.2023 | PL | 29.11.2023 | RO | 29.11.2023 | RS | 29.11.2023 | SE | 29.11.2023 | SK | 29.11.2023 | SM | 29.11.2023 | BG | 29.02.2024 | NO | 29.02.2024 | GR | 01.03.2024 | IS | 29.03.2024 | PT | 01.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 29.11.2023 | |
CZ | 29.11.2023 | ||
DK | 29.11.2023 | ||
EE | 29.11.2023 | ||
ES | 29.11.2023 | ||
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LV | 29.11.2023 | ||
NL | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RO | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SE | 29.11.2023 | ||
SM | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | DK | 29.11.2023 | |
ES | 29.11.2023 | ||
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LV | 29.11.2023 | ||
NL | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SE | 29.11.2023 | ||
SM | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/27] | ES | 29.11.2023 | |
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LV | 29.11.2023 | ||
NL | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SE | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 29.11.2023 | |
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 01.03.2024 | |
IS | 29.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US2011108557 (TANI TATSUSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 4,5 * figure 2 * [A] 1-3,6-8; | [YA]WO2015197457 (KAUTEX TEXTRON GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [Y] 4,5 * figure 3 * [A] 1-3,6-8; | [YA]JP5979446B (TOYODA GOSEI KK) [Y] 4,5 * figure 2 * [A] 1-3,6-8; | [A]WO2017125098 (HPC RES S R O [CZ]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [XAYI]EP2778499 (TOFAS TURK OTOMOBIL FABRIKASI AS [TR]) [X] 1,2,6 * figure 1 * [A] 3 [Y] 4,5 [I] 7,8; | [YA]WO2020002467 (PLASTIC OMNIUM ADVANCED INNOVATION & RES [BE]) [Y] 4,5 * figure 2b *[A] 1-3,6-8; | [XAYI]US2020158286 (CRIEL BJORN [BE]) [X] 1,2,6 * figure 7B * [A] 3 [Y] 4,5 [I] 7,8 |