EP3922094 - WORK VEHICLE WITH HANDLE ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.08.2023 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.12.2023 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kubota Corporation 2-47, Shikitsuhigashi 1-chome Naniwa-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 556-8601 / JP | [2021/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TASHIMA, Shinya SAKAI-SHI, 5900823 / JP | 02 /
AKAI, Yuto SAKAI-SHI, 5900823 / JP | 03 /
KAGO, Tatsuki SAKAI-SHI, 5900823 / JP | 04 /
YAMASHITA, Nobuyuki SAKAI-SHI, 5900823 / JP | 05 /
KUMASHIRO, Takashi SAKAI-SHI, 5900823 / JP | 06 /
HABU, Kentaro SAKAI-SHI, 5900823 / JP | 07 /
KASETANI, Takahiro SAKAI-SHI, 5900823 / JP | 08 /
HIRAI, Ryota SAKAI-SHI, 5900823 / JP | 09 /
AKITA, Masayuki SAKAI-SHI, 5900823 / JP | 10 /
SATO, Seiya SAKAI-SHI, 5900823 / JP | 11 /
TONOYA, Yoshihisa SAKAI-SHI, 5900823 / JP | 12 /
YAMAMOTO, Tomohisa SAKAI-SHI, 5900823 / JP | 13 /
KAWAMOTO, Ryusuke SAKAI-SHI, 5900823 / JP | 14 /
AMAGATA, Nobuhiko SAKAI-SHI, 5900823 / JP | [2021/50] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [2021/50] | Application number, filing date | 21190013.9 | 21.10.2019 | [2021/50] | Priority number, date | JP20180199972 | 24.10.2018 Original published format: JP 2018199972 | JP20190046289 | 13.03.2019 Original published format: JP 2019046289 | JP20190055484 | 22.03.2019 Original published format: JP 2019055484 | [2021/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3922094 | Date: | 15.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A01D34/82, A01D34/66, A01D67/04, B62D49/08, B66F3/08, // E02F9/18 | [2021/50] | CPC: |
A01D67/04 (EP);
A01D34/66 (EP);
A01D34/82 (EP);
A01D34/824 (EP);
B62D49/085 (EP);
B66F3/08 (EP);
E02F9/18 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/50] | Title | German: | NUTZFAHRZEUG MIT GRIFFANORDNUNG | [2021/50] | English: | WORK VEHICLE WITH HANDLE ASSEMBLY | [2021/50] | French: | ENGIN DE TRAVAIL AVEC ASSEMBLAGE DE POIGNÉES | [2021/50] | Examination procedure | 06.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/50] | 15.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP19204229.9 / EP3643158 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2008193932 (YANMAR CO LTD) [X] 1,2 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0017] * * figures 1-4 *; | [X]US2013193710 (KIMURA SHIGEHARU [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,4 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0023] * * figures 1-2 *; | [X]JP2015074326 (MITSUBISHI AGRICULTURAL MACH) [X] 1,2 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0015] * * figures 1(A), 1(B), 2 *; | [XY]US2017167112 (NAGAI HIROKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,6 * paragraph [0123] - paragraph [0124]; figures 1-3 * [Y] 5,7; | [Y]US2017190247 (SHARKAR FAHMID [US]) [Y] 5,7 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0039] ** figures 1-7 *; | [XPA]EP3470583 (KUBOTA KK [JP]) [XP] 1,2 * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0038]; figures 1-3 * [A] 3-7 | by applicant | JP2004236616 | JP2014205368 | JP2018201383 |