EP4101579 - METHOD OF WELDING A BATTERY COVER PLATE USING TWO DIFFERENT LASER BEAM CONDITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.01.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.11.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CALB Technology Co., Ltd. No.166 Kejiao Road, Jintan District Changzhou City, Jiangsu Province / CN | For all designated states CALB Co., Ltd. No. 1 Jiangdong Road Jintan District Changzhou City, Jiangsu Province / CN | [2022/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZENG, Tianxing Changzhou City / CN | 02 /
SONG, Ruxin Changzhou City / CN | 03 /
LI, Xiaopo Luoyang City / CN | 04 /
FAN, Yanliang Changzhou City / CN | [2022/50] | Representative(s) | Becker, Eberhard Becker Kurig & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Bavariastraße 7 80336 München / DE | [2022/50] | Application number, filing date | 21190238.2 | 09.08.2021 | [2022/50] | Priority number, date | CN202110631128 | 07.06.2021 Original published format: CN202110631128 | [2022/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4101579 | Date: | 14.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4101579 | Date: | 10.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B23K26/06, B23K26/067, B23K26/20, B23K26/242, B23K26/28, B23K26/32, H01M50/169, B23K31/00, // B23K101/04, B23K101/36, B23K103/10 | [2022/50] | CPC: |
B23K26/0604 (EP);
B23K26/21 (CN);
B23K26/24 (US);
B23K26/042 (US);
B23K26/0626 (US);
B23K26/067 (EP);
B23K26/206 (EP);
B23K26/242 (EP);
B23K26/28 (EP);
B23K26/32 (EP);
B23K26/70 (CN);
B23K31/003 (EP);
H01M50/169 (EP,US);
B23K2101/04 (EP);
B23K2101/36 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/50] | Title | German: | SCHWEISSVERFAHREN EINER BATTERIEABDECKPLATTE UNTER VERWENDUNG VON ZWEI UNTERSCHIEDLICHEN LASERSTRAHL-BEDINGUNGEN | [2022/50] | English: | METHOD OF WELDING A BATTERY COVER PLATE USING TWO DIFFERENT LASER BEAM CONDITIONS | [2022/50] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE SOUDAGE DE PLAQUE DE COUVERCLE DE BATTERIE EN UTILISANT DEUX CONDITIONS DIFFÉRENTES POUR LES FAISCEAUX LASER | [2022/50] | Examination procedure | 09.08.2021 | Examination requested [2022/50] | 13.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.01.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 28.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 10.04.2024 | [2024/44] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2011240613 (HOSOKAWA HIROSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,5,10* figure -; example 1; claim - *; | [XI]JP2015163412 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [X] 1,3,6,7 * abstract * * paragraphs [0009] , [0052]; figure - * [I] 2,4,5,8-10; | [X]US2015349303 (UMEYAMA HIROYA [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,6,7 * figure -; example -; claim - * |