EP3971298 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR INDUCING AN ENHANCED IMMUNE RESPONSE USING POXVIRUS VECTORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.11.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bavarian Nordic A/S Philip Heymans Alle 3 2900 Hellerup / DK | [2022/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hausmann, Jürgen 79194 Gundelfingen / DE | 02 /
Wolferstätter, Michael 81737 Munich / DE | [2022/12] | Representative(s) | Preuß, Ilka Susanne c/o Bavarian Nordic GmbH Fraunhoferstraße 13 82152 Martinsried / DE | [2022/12] | Application number, filing date | 21190638.3 | 25.11.2014 | [2022/12] | Priority number, date | EP20130005541 | 28.11.2013 Original published format: EP 13005541 | [2022/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3971298 | Date: | 23.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3971298 | Date: | 27.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/86, A61K39/12, C12N15/117, A61P31/20, A61P37/04 | [2022/17] | CPC: |
A61P31/20 (EP,IL);
A61K39/275 (IL,KR);
C12N7/00 (IL,KR,US);
C12N15/117 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K39/12 (EP);
A61K39/39 (IL,US);
A61P37/04 (EP,IL);
A61P43/00 (IL);
C12N15/86 (IL,KR,US);
A61K2039/55561 (IL,US);
A61K2039/57 (EP);
C12N2310/17 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C12N2310/53 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C12N2330/51 (IL,KR,US);
C12N2710/24021 (IL,US);
|
Former IPC [2022/12] | C12N15/86 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/49] |
Former [2022/12] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | 27.10.2022 | ME | 27.10.2022 | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR INDUZIERUNG EINER VERSTÄRKTEN IMMUNANTWORT MIT POCKENVIRUSVEKTOREN | [2022/12] | English: | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR INDUCING AN ENHANCED IMMUNE RESPONSE USING POXVIRUS VECTORS | [2022/12] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET MÉTHODES PERMETTANT D'INDUIRE UNE RÉPONSE IMMUNITAIRE AMÉLIORÉE AU MOYEN DES VECTEURS DE POXVIRUS | [2022/12] | Examination procedure | 27.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.10.2022 | Examination requested [2022/49] | 27.10.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14806215.1 / EP3074517 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 04.10.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2027033 (GREEN CROSS CORP); | [Y]WO2004009763 (UNIV ARIZONA [US], et al); | [A]US2005281782 (KAUFMAN HOWARD [US], et al); | [A]US2006073594 (YAO JIANSHENG [CA], et al); | by applicant | US5185146 | US6194388 | US6207646 | WO0242480 | WO03048184 | US2003206926 | US2006159699 | US7211432 | WO2011092029 |