EP3974002 - FLUID STERILIZATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.11.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.09.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toshiba Lighting & Technology Corporation 1-201-1 Funakoshi-cho Yokosuka-shi, Kanagawa 237-8510 / JP | [2022/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KATO, Takeo Ehime / JP | 02 /
FUJIOKA, Atsushi Ehime / JP | 03 /
SAKURAI, Naoto Ehime / JP | 04 /
IIDA, Seiya Ehime / JP | 05 /
OCHI, Takanori Ehime / JP | [2022/13] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Junkersgatan 1 582 35 Linköping / SE | [2022/13] | Application number, filing date | 21190805.8 | 11.08.2021 | [2022/13] | Priority number, date | JP20200162415 | 28.09.2020 Original published format: JP 2020162415 | [2022/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3974002 | Date: | 30.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3974002 | Date: | 06.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61L2/10, C02F1/32 | [2022/13] | CPC: |
C02F1/32 (EP);
C02F1/325 (US);
C02F2201/004 (EP,US);
C02F2201/3222 (US);
C02F2201/3223 (EP);
C02F2201/3228 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/42] |
Former [2022/13] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | FLÜSSIGKEITSSTERILISATIONSVORRICHTUNG | [2022/13] | English: | FLUID STERILIZATION DEVICE | [2022/13] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE STÉRILISATION DE FLUIDE | [2022/13] | Examination procedure | 09.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.09.2022 | Examination requested [2022/42] | 09.09.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 30.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 06.03.2024 | ES | 06.03.2024 | FI | 06.03.2024 | HR | 06.03.2024 | LT | 06.03.2024 | LV | 06.03.2024 | NL | 06.03.2024 | SE | 06.03.2024 | NO | 06.06.2024 | RS | 06.06.2024 | GR | 07.06.2024 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/37] | BG | 06.03.2024 | |
ES | 06.03.2024 | ||
FI | 06.03.2024 | ||
HR | 06.03.2024 | ||
LT | 06.03.2024 | ||
LV | 06.03.2024 | ||
SE | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.06.2024 | ||
RS | 06.06.2024 | ||
GR | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/36] | BG | 06.03.2024 | |
ES | 06.03.2024 | ||
FI | 06.03.2024 | ||
HR | 06.03.2024 | ||
LT | 06.03.2024 | ||
LV | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.06.2024 | ||
RS | 06.06.2024 | ||
GR | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | BG | 06.03.2024 | |
ES | 06.03.2024 | ||
FI | 06.03.2024 | ||
HR | 06.03.2024 | ||
LT | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.06.2024 | ||
RS | 06.06.2024 | ||
GR | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 06.03.2024 | |
NO | 06.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2493705 (DETEC SA [CH]); | [Y]US5474748 (SZABO LOUIS [CA]); | [Y]US5935431 (KORIN AMOS [US]); | [A]CN106390696 (FUZHOU PINXING SCIENCE & TECH DEV CO LTD); | [A]US2017354920 (SWITZER ELISE [US], et al); | [Y]JP2020044515 (TOSHIBA LIGHTING & TECHNOLOGY) |