EP3896597 - METHOD, APPARATUS FOR TEXT GENERATION, DEVICE AND STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.06.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.09.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.07.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.06.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.07.2023 [2023/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beijing Baidu Netcom Science and Technology Co., Ltd. 2/F Baidu Campus No.10, Shangdi 10th Street Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2021/42] | For all designated states Beijing Baidu Netcom Science and Technology Co., Ltd. 2/F Baidu Campus No.10 Shangdi 10th Street Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Jiachen Beijing, 100085 / CN | 02 /
XIAO, Xinyan Beijing, 100085 / CN | 03 /
WU, Hua Beijing, 100085 / CN | 04 /
WANG, Haifeng Beijing, 100085 / CN | [2021/42] | Representative(s) | advotec. Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft Tappe mbB Widenmayerstraße 4 80538 München / DE | [2021/42] | Application number, filing date | 21190998.1 | 12.08.2021 | [2021/42] | Priority number, date | CN202010991790 | 21.09.2020 Original published format: CN202010991790 | [2021/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3896597 | Date: | 20.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3896597 | Date: | 02.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06F40/30, G06F40/56, G06F40/279, G06N20/00 | [2022/09] | CPC: |
G06F40/30 (EP);
G06F40/186 (CN,KR);
G06F40/295 (US);
G06F16/3322 (KR);
G06F16/35 (CN,KR);
G06F16/355 (EP);
G06F40/103 (KR);
G06F40/279 (EP);
G06F40/56 (EP,US);
G06N20/00 (US);
G06N3/044 (EP,CN,KR);
G06N3/045 (EP,CN,KR);
|
Former IPC [2021/42] | G06F40/30, G06F40/56 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/32] |
Former [2021/42] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND GERÄT ZUR TEXTERZEUGUNG SOWIE VORRICHTUNG UND SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2021/43] | English: | METHOD, APPARATUS FOR TEXT GENERATION, DEVICE AND STORAGE MEDIUM | [2021/42] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, APPAREIL DE GÉNÉRATION DE TEXTE, DISPOSITIF ET SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT | [2021/43] |
Former [2021/42] | VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG ZUR TEXTERZEUGUNG, GERÄT UND SPEICHERMEDIUM | ||
Former [2021/42] | MÉTHODE, APPAREIL POUR LA GÉNÉRATION DE TEXTE, DISPOSITIF ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE | Examination procedure | 30.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/32] | 30.06.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.02.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/28] | 09.03.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/28] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2018203852 (GOYAL RAGHAV [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,14,15 * claims 1-15 *; | [XI]US2018329883 (LEIDNER JOCHEN L [GB], et al) [X] 1,2,14,15 * paragraphs [0019] - [0052]; figure 2; claims 1-10 * [I] 3-13; | [X]US2020042547 (PRAKASH AADITYA [US], et al) [X] 1,2,14,15 * abstract *; | [X]US2020175229 (IWAKURA TOMOYA [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,14,15* abstract * |