EP3958197 - AN ENTERPRISE SOFTWARE DEVELOPMENT DASHBOARD TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.08.2022 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.05.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hexaware Technologies Limited 152 Sector-III Millenium Business Park 'A' Block TTC Industrial Area Mahape, Navi Mumbai 400710 / IN | [2022/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FOX, Neil Evan Raleigh, 27609 / US | 02 /
Arnold Dias, Audey Navi Mumbai Maharashtra - 400709 / IN | [2022/08] | Representative(s) | GatesIP Dorfplatz 1 6060 Sarnen / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2022/08] | GatesIP Siedlungsstraße 4a 85253 Erdweg / DE | Application number, filing date | 21191558.2 | 16.08.2021 | [2022/08] | Priority number, date | IN202021035406 | 17.08.2020 Original published format: IN202021035406 | [2022/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3958197 | Date: | 23.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/06, // G06F8/70 | [2022/08] | CPC: |
G06Q10/06315 (EP);
G06Q10/06393 (US);
G06F8/22 (US);
G06Q10/0635 (EP);
G06Q30/0609 (US);
G06F8/77 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/39] |
Former [2022/08] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DASHBOARD-WERKZEUG ZUR ENTWICKLUNG VON UNTERNEHMENSSOFTWARE | [2022/08] | English: | AN ENTERPRISE SOFTWARE DEVELOPMENT DASHBOARD TOOL | [2022/08] | French: | OUTIL DE TABLEAU DE BORD DE DÉVELOPPEMENT DE LOGICIELS D'ENTREPRISE | [2022/08] | Examination procedure | 23.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/39] | 23.08.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2015082281 (KOENIG DAVID IRA [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0053]; figure 1 *; | [I]US2018082242 (STRANGE MARK [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0042]; figures 1, 2 * | [I] - Wikipedia, "Confluence (software)", INTERNET ARTICLE, (20200815), URL: https://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=Confluence_(software)&oldid=973160953, (20220110), XP055877129 [I] 1-15 * page 1 * | [I] - Wikipedia, "Jira (software)", INTERNET ARTICLE, (20200814), URL: https://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=Jira_(software)&oldid=972860538, (20220110), XP055877133 [I] 1-15 * page 1 - page 2 * | [I] - Wikipedia, "Katalon Studio", INTERNET ARTICLE, (20200618), URL: https://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=Katalon_Studio&oldid=963256501, (20220110), XP055877149 [I] 1-15 * page 2 - page 4 * |