EP3950517 - LABELLING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.11.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.10.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.03.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PL, PT, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bizerba SE & Co. KG Wilhelm-Kraut-Straße 65 72336 Balingen / DE | [2022/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kraft, Martin 72356 Dautmergen / DE | 02 /
Weckenmann, Kevin 72355 Schömberg / DE | 03 /
Strücker, Florian 72351 Geislingen / DE | [2022/06] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [2022/06] | Application number, filing date | 21191686.1 | 21.03.2018 | [2022/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3950517 | Date: | 09.02.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3950517 | Date: | 20.12.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B65C1/02, B65C9/00, B65C9/42 | [2022/06] | CPC: |
B65C1/02 (EP,US);
B65C9/00 (EP,US);
B65C9/42 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/14] |
Former [2022/06] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ETIKETTIERVORRICHTUNG | [2022/06] | English: | LABELLING DEVICE | [2022/06] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ÉTIQUETAGE | [2022/06] | Examination procedure | 24.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/14] | 24.02.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 10.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP18163141.7 / EP3543155 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 20.12.2023 | EE | 20.12.2023 | ES | 20.12.2023 | FI | 20.12.2023 | HR | 20.12.2023 | LT | 20.12.2023 | LV | 20.12.2023 | NL | 20.12.2023 | PL | 20.12.2023 | RO | 20.12.2023 | RS | 20.12.2023 | SE | 20.12.2023 | SK | 20.12.2023 | SM | 20.12.2023 | BG | 20.03.2024 | NO | 20.03.2024 | GR | 21.03.2024 | IS | 20.04.2024 | PT | 22.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 20.12.2023 | |
EE | 20.12.2023 | ||
ES | 20.12.2023 | ||
FI | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
LV | 20.12.2023 | ||
NL | 20.12.2023 | ||
RO | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
SM | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
IS | 20.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 20.12.2023 | |
FI | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
LV | 20.12.2023 | ||
NL | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
SM | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
IS | 20.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | ES | 20.12.2023 | |
FI | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
LV | 20.12.2023 | ||
NL | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
IS | 20.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/27] | ES | 20.12.2023 | |
FI | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
LV | 20.12.2023 | ||
NL | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | FI | 20.12.2023 | |
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 21.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2076549 (TERAOKA SEIKOSHO KK) [A] 1-14 * page 10, line 108 - page 11, line 25 * * page 11, line 94 - line 105 * * figures 14-18 *; | [A]GB2253829 (BERKEL LTD [GB]) [A] 1-14* page 6, line 4 - line 26; figures 1-3 *; | [A]WO9308081 (BIZERBA WERKE KRAUT KG WILH [DE]) [A] 1-14 * page 8, paragraph 3 - paragraph 4 * * page 10, paragraph 2 - paragraph 4 * * figures 1, 6 *; | [ID]DE102013203456 (BIZERBA GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [ID] 1-14 * paragraphs [0024] , [0 28] , [0 29] , [0 31] , [0 32]; figures 1-3 * | by applicant | DE102013203456 |