EP4138226 - RF CONNECTOR WITH ARC SUPPRESSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.01.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.01.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.02.2024 [2024/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Spinner GmbH Erzgiessereistrasse 33 80335 München / DE | [2023/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NEUMAIER, Christoph 85625 Baiern / DE | 02 /
BAUMGARTNER, Bernhard 83620 Feldkirchen-Westerham / DE | 03 /
LANDINGER, Josef 83229 Aschau / DE | 04 /
PRÖCKL, Thomas 83043 Bad Aibling / DE | [2023/08] | Representative(s) | Lohr, Jöstingmeier & Partner Junkersstraße 3 82178 Puchheim/München / DE | [2023/08] | Application number, filing date | 21191786.9 | 17.08.2021 | [2023/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4138226 | Date: | 22.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/53, H01R24/40, // H01R13/24, H01R103/00 | [2023/08] | CPC: |
H01R13/53 (EP);
H01R24/40 (EP);
H01R13/2421 (EP);
H01R2103/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HF-ANSCHLUSS MIT LICHTBOGENUNTERDRÜCKUNG | [2023/08] | English: | RF CONNECTOR WITH ARC SUPPRESSION | [2023/08] | French: | CONNECTEUR RF AVEC SUPPRESSION D'ARC | [2023/08] | Examination procedure | 23.08.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/07] | 28.09.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2024/07] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2023 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAYI]DE497612 (AEG) [X] 1-6,12 * figure 1 * * page 1 * [A] 13,14 [Y] 15 [I] 7-11; | [A]DE10139844 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [A] 1 * figures 1, 2 ** columns 1-7 *; | [Y]US7021964 (CROAN QUINN F [US]) [Y] 15 * figures 1-8 * * columns 5-12 *; | [A]US8771012 (LE TORTOREC CHRISTIAN [FR], et al) [A] 8,9 * figure 6 * * abstract *; | [A]CN207782024U (GUIZHOU SPACE APPLIANCE CO LTD) [A] 13,14 * figures 1, 2 * * abstract *; | [A]EP3474389 (VESTEL ELEKTRONIK SANAYI VE TICARET AS [TR]) [A] 8,9 * figure 6 * * abstract * | by applicant | EP3300535 |