EP3967411 - CONCENTRATE CARTRIDGE WITH MEMBRANE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.07.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.06.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states iDispense, LLC. 3610 Holland-Sylvania Road Toledo, OH 43615 / US | [2022/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yacko, R. Bruce Toledo, 43615 / US | 02 /
Yacko, Christopher J. Toledo, 43615 / US | 03 /
Sikula, Martin Toledo, 43615 / US | [2022/11] | Representative(s) | Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/11] | Rupprecht, Kay Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 47 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21192059.0 | 19.08.2021 | [2022/11] | Priority number, date | US202063067677P | 19.08.2020 Original published format: US 202063067677 P | US202117405467 | 18.08.2021 Original published format: US202117405467 | [2022/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3967411 | Date: | 16.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B05B11/00 | [2022/11] | CPC: |
B05B11/0081 (EP,US);
B65D81/3283 (US);
B05B11/0054 (US);
B65D51/2864 (US);
B65D81/3205 (US);
B65D81/3216 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/27] |
Former [2022/11] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KONZENTRATKARTUSCHE MIT MEMBRAN | [2022/11] | English: | CONCENTRATE CARTRIDGE WITH MEMBRANE | [2022/11] | French: | CARTOUCHE DE CONCENTRÉ À MEMBRANE | [2022/11] | Examination procedure | 27.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/27] | 27.05.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US3655096 (EASTER ROSS A); | [AD]US6041969 (PARISE BERNARDINO [IT]); | [AD]US6290100 (YACKO R BRUCE [US], et al); | [X]US6305576 (LEONCAVALLO RICHARD A [US]); | [A]US2008116221 (ROTH DONNA [US], et al); | [A]US2018118427 (LEE YOUNG JAE [KR], et al) | by applicant | US2653611 | US3024947 | US3347410 | US3655096 | US5957335 | US6041969 | US6290100 |