EP3936466 - MODULAR CONVEYOR SYSTEM WITH A SYSTEM FOR ATTACHING AND DETACHING CARRIAGES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.09.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.09.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.06.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hayden AG Baarerstrasse 125 6300 Zug / CH | [2022/41] |
Former [2022/02] | For all designated states Hayden AG Gotthardstr. 28 6302 Zug / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Neofytidis, Georgios 75391 Gechingen / DE | [2022/02] | Representative(s) | Christ, Niko Geitz Patentanwälte PartG mbB Obere Wässere 3-7 72764 Reutlingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/02] | Christ, Niko Geitz Truckenmüller Lucht Christ Patentanwälte PartGmbB Obere Wässere 3-7 72764 Reutlingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 21192111.9 | 12.01.2021 | [2022/02] | Priority number, date | DE202010103209 | 07.02.2020 Original published format: DE102020103209 | [2022/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3936466 | Date: | 12.01.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3936466 | Date: | 02.11.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B65G49/04, B62D65/18, // B65G19/02, B65G47/64 | [2022/02] | CPC: |
B65G49/0463 (EP);
B65G49/0459 (EP);
B62D65/18 (EP);
B65G19/02 (EP);
B65G2201/0294 (EP);
B65G47/642 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/02] | Title | German: | MODULARES FÖRDERSYSTEM MIT EINEM SYSTEM ZUM EINFÄDELN UND AUSFÄDELN VON FAHRWAGEN | [2022/02] | English: | MODULAR CONVEYOR SYSTEM WITH A SYSTEM FOR ATTACHING AND DETACHING CARRIAGES | [2022/02] | French: | SYSTÈME MODULAIRE DE TRANSPORT DOTÉ D'UN SYSTÈME D'INSERTION ET DE RETRAIT DE CHARIOTS | [2022/02] | Examination procedure | 19.08.2021 | Examination requested [2022/02] | 14.06.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 20.09.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.09.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP21151193.6 / EP3862303 | Opposition(s) | 03.08.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/41] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 02.11.2022 | MC | 02.11.2022 | RS | 02.11.2022 | SM | 02.11.2022 | NO | 02.02.2023 | IS | 02.03.2023 | [2024/29] |
Former [2023/37] | AL | 02.11.2022 | |
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | RS | 02.11.2022 | |
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/27] | RS | 02.11.2022 | |
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | NO | 02.02.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2005115886 (DUERR SYSTEMS GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1 * page 8 - page 16; figures 1-7 *; | [A]JP2012017177 (DAIFUKU KK) [A] 3 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0042]; figures 1-15 *; | [A]WO2012152385 (EISENMANN AG [DE], et al) [A] 3* page 5 - page 10; figure 6 *; | [AD]WO2019000005 (FEHBERGER ALEX [AT]) [AD] 1 * page 10, line 19 - page 10, line 30; figure 6 *; | [AD]WO2019025941 (GEICO SPA [IT]) [AD] 1-11 * page 3 - page 9; figures 1-7 * | by applicant | DE4304145 | DE19641048 | DE20022634U | US2003097982 | WO03070545 | US2005139451 | JP2010194447 | DE102013217794 | DE102014001878 | WO2019000005 | WO2019025941 |