EP4024650 - BATTERY CONTROL METHOD AND BATTERY SYSTEM ENABLING BATTERY CONTROL METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HYUNDAI MOTOR COMPANY 12, Heolleung-ro, Seocho-gu Seoul 06797 / KR | For all designated states Kia Corporation 12, Heolleung-ro Seocho-gu Seoul 06797 / KR | [2022/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Hojoong 18280 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
KIM, HyeSeung 18280 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
JANG, Youngjin 18280 Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2022/27] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2022/27] | Application number, filing date | 21192117.6 | 19.08.2021 | [2022/27] | Priority number, date | KR20200189775 | 31.12.2020 Original published format: KR 20200189775 | [2022/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4024650 | Date: | 06.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H02J5/00, H02J7/00, H02J7/02, B60L53/14, B60L53/22, H02M3/00, H02M7/68, B60L1/00 | [2022/27] | CPC: |
B60L53/14 (EP,US);
B60L53/24 (KR);
B60L53/20 (CN,US);
H02J7/007 (US);
B60L1/00 (EP);
B60L50/53 (KR);
B60L53/16 (KR);
B60L53/22 (EP,US);
B60L58/10 (CN);
B60L58/12 (KR,US);
H02J7/0068 (EP);
H02J7/02 (EP,KR,US);
H02J7/34 (KR);
B60L2210/10 (KR);
B60L2210/30 (EP,KR);
B60L2240/527 (KR);
B60L2260/40 (KR);
B60Y2200/91 (KR);
H02J2207/20 (KR);
H02J2310/48 (EP,US);
Y02T10/70 (EP,KR);
Y02T10/7072 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/06] |
Former [2022/27] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BATTERIESTEUERUNGSVERFAHREN UND BATTERIESYSTEM, DAS DIESES BATTERIESTEUERUNGSVERFAHREN ERMÖGLICHT | [2022/27] | English: | BATTERY CONTROL METHOD AND BATTERY SYSTEM ENABLING BATTERY CONTROL METHOD | [2022/27] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE BATTERIE ET SYSTÈME DE BATTERIE PERMETTANT LE PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE BATTERIE | [2022/27] | Examination procedure | 02.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/06] | 02.01.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2012169023 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,6-15 * figures 1,4-8 * * paragraphs [0044] - [0068] * [I] 5; | [XI]US2017320396 (KIM JEE HEON [KR], et al) [X] 1-7,9-15 * figures 1-4 * * paragraphs [0010] , [0025] - [0030] - [0042] - [0044] *[I] 8; | [X]US2020086755 (MARUYAMA AKINORI [JP]) [X] 1-15 * figures 1-5 * * paragraphs [0021] - [0028] * |