EP3957176 - METHOD FOR CONTROLLING HERBICIDE RESISTANT OR TOLERANT WEEDS, HERBICIDAL COMPOSITION AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING UNDESIRABLE VEGETATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.08.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Agro B.V. Velperplein 23 6811 AH Arnhem / NL | [2023/32] |
Former [2022/08] | For all designated states BASF Agro B.V. Groningensingel 1 6835 EA Arnhem / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kraus, Helmut Research Triangle Park / US | 02 /
Sievernich, Bernd Limburgerhof / DE | 03 /
Etcheverry, Mariano Kiev / UA | 04 /
Evans, Richard R Raleigh / US | 05 /
Nielson, Ryan Louis Limburgerhof / DE | 06 /
Landes, Andreas Limburgerhof / DE | 07 /
Zagar, Cyrill Research Triangle Park / US | 08 /
Liebl, Rex A Research Triangle Park / US | [2022/08] | Representative(s) | BASF IP Association BASF SE GBI-C006 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2022/08] | Application number, filing date | 21192199.4 | 06.07.2016 | [2022/08] | Priority number, date | US201562190788P | 10.07.2015 Original published format: US 201562190788 P | EP20150191791 | 28.10.2015 Original published format: EP 15191791 | [2022/08] | Previously filed application, date | WO2016EP66012 | 06.07.2016 | [2022/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3957176 | Date: | 23.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A01N43/90, A01P13/00 | [2022/08] | CPC: |
A01N43/90 (EP,KR);
A01G7/06 (KR);
A01N43/54 (KR);
A01N43/56 (KR);
A01N43/60 (KR);
A01N43/80 (KR);
A01N43/86 (KR);
A01N47/36 (KR);
A01N47/38 (KR);
| C-Set: |
A01N43/90, A01N33/22, A01N37/22, A01N39/02, A01N41/10, A01N43/20, A01N43/54, A01N43/56, A01N43/60, A01N43/80, A01N43/84, A01N43/86, A01N47/36, A01N47/38 (EP);
A01N43/90, A01N37/22, A01N39/02, A01N41/10, A01N43/20, A01N43/54, A01N43/56, A01N43/60, A01N43/80, A01N43/86, A01N47/36, A01N47/38, A01N2300/00 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/39] |
Former [2022/08] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Validation states | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEKÄMPFUNG VON HERBIZIDRESISTENTEN ODER -TOLERANTEN UNKRÄUTERN, HERBIZIDE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEKÄMPFUNG UNERWÜNSCHTER VEGETATION | [2022/08] | English: | METHOD FOR CONTROLLING HERBICIDE RESISTANT OR TOLERANT WEEDS, HERBICIDAL COMPOSITION AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING UNDESIRABLE VEGETATION | [2022/08] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR LUTTER CONTRE LES MAUVAISES HERBES TOLÉRANTES OU RÉSISTANTES AUX HERBICIDES, COMPOSITION HERBICIDE ET PROCÉDÉ DE LUTTE CONTRE LA VÉGÉTATION INDÉSIRABLE | [2022/08] | Examination procedure | 10.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/39] | 23.08.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16736843.0 / EP3319442 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO8802598 (DU PONT [US]); | [A]JPH06145006 (DOWELANCO); | [A]US2005250646 (KAWASAKI HIROSHI [JP], et al); | [A]JP2006131602 (MARUWA BIOCHEMICAL CO LTD); | [IDY]WO2007023099 (BASF AG [DE], et al); | [AD]WO2007030886 (NUFARM AUSTRALIA LTD [AU], et al); | [A]CN102461547B (NANJING HUAZHOU PHARMACEUTICAL); | [A]US2014031228 (MANN RICHARD K [US], et al); |