EP3957371 - CONTAINER FOR DAMAGED ITEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.10.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.08.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2024 | First examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Paul Müller GmbH Brobbecke 1 58802 Balve / DE | [2022/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MÜLLER, Tobias 58802 Balve / DE | 02 /
MÜLLER, Matthias 58802 Balve / DE | 03 /
SCHARF, Matthias 58802 Balve / DE | [2022/08] | Representative(s) | Haverkamp Patentanwälte PartG mbB Gartenstraße 61 58636 Iserlohn / DE | [2022/08] | Application number, filing date | 21192284.4 | 20.08.2021 | [2022/08] | Priority number, date | DE202020104825U | 20.08.2020 Original published format: DE 202020104825 U | [2022/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3957371 | Date: | 23.02.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A62C3/07, A62C3/16, B60P3/12 | [2022/08] | CPC: |
A62C3/07 (EP);
A62C3/16 (EP);
B60P3/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/38] |
Former [2022/08] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HAVARIEBEHÄLTER | [2022/08] | English: | CONTAINER FOR DAMAGED ITEMS | [2022/08] | French: | RÉCIPIENT D'AVARIE | [2022/08] | Examination procedure | 11.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/38] | 11.08.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.10.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE102016211854 (ELLERMANN EUROCON GMBH [DE]); | [I]DE202019104363U (PAUL MUELLER TRANSP UND VERPACKUNGSMITTEL GMBH [DE]); | [A]DE202019104504U (ELLERMANN EUROCON GMBH [DE]) | by applicant | DE202019104363U |