EP3968317 - PORTABLE TERMINAL CAPABLE OF CONTROLLING BACKLIGHT AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING BACKLIGHT THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.06.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2022/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JANG, Woo-Seok 16677 Suwon-si / KR | 02 /
PARK, Jin-Sung 16677 Suwon-si / KR | 03 /
OH, Hyong-Sog 16677 Suwon-si / KR | 04 /
KIM, Ji-Hwa 16677 Suwon-si / KR | [2022/11] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [2022/11] | Application number, filing date | 21192473.3 | 17.02.2006 | [2022/11] | Priority number, date | KR20050049300 | 09.06.2005 Original published format: KR 20050049300 | [2022/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3968317 | Date: | 16.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/34, H04M1/22, G06F3/02, G06F3/041, G09G5/10, H04W52/02, G06F3/048, G06F3/0484 | [2022/11] | CPC: |
G09G3/3406 (EP,US);
G09G5/10 (US);
G06F3/02 (US);
G06F3/041 (US);
G06F3/04847 (US);
H04B1/40 (KR);
H04M1/22 (EP,US);
H04W52/027 (EP,US);
G09G2320/06 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2022/30] |
Former [2022/11] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ZUR STEUERUNG DER RÜCKBELEUCHTUNG FÄHIGES, TRAGBARES ENDGERÄT UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG DER RÜCKBELEUCHTUNG DAVON | [2022/11] | English: | PORTABLE TERMINAL CAPABLE OF CONTROLLING BACKLIGHT AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING BACKLIGHT THEREOF | [2022/11] | French: | TERMINAL PORTABLE À COMMANDE DE RÉTROÉCLAIRAGE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE RÉTROÉCLAIRAGE | [2022/11] | Examination procedure | 17.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/30] | 17.06.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06003281.0 / EP1732059 | EP17164973.4 / EP3211633 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 20.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 20.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 20.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 20.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 20.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 20.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 23.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 23.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 18 | 21.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 19 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0041378 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI], et al) [A] 1-6 * page 2, line 28 - page 4, line 22 * * page 5, line 15 - page 8, line 27 * * page 15, line 9 - page 17, line 6 * * figures 1-3,6,11 *; | [A]US2001013854 (OGORO KAZUO [JP]) [A] 1-6 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0061] * * figures 6,7 *; | [A]US2003022699 (LIN CHING-YUAN [TW]) [A] 1-6 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0009] ** figure 1 *; | [A]GB2403096 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-6 * page 3, line 20 - page 8, line 24 * * figure 1 *; | [Y]US2005054384 (PASQUALE THEODORE [US], et al) [Y] 1-6 * paragraphs [0013] , [0029] , [0032]; figures 1-3 *; | [Y] - Sony Ericsson, "Sony Ericsson T230 user manual - Second edition (2004)", (20040101), URL: http://www.o2.co.uk/deviceinfo/device-pdfs/sonyericssont230eng.pdf, (20170630), XP055387013 [Y] 1-6 * page 18 - page 22 * |