EP4140706 - HEATING ELEMENT AND WELDING KIT FOR RESISTANCE WELDING AND METHODS OF MANUFACTURING A HEATING ELEMENT AND WELDING THERMOPLASTIC COMPONENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.08.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.01.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Airbus Operations GmbH Kreetslag 10 21129 Hamburg / DE | [2023/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vichniakov, Alexei 21129 Hamburg / DE | 02 /
Finger, Lennart 21129 Hamburg / DE | 03 /
Sutii, Victor 21129 Hamburg / DE | [2023/09] | Representative(s) | Schornack, Oliver Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/09] | Schornack, Oliver Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21192606.8 | 23.08.2021 | [2023/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4140706 | Date: | 01.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B29C65/34, // B29K101/12, B29K105/06, B29K307/04, B29K309/08, B29L31/30 | [2023/09] | CPC: |
B29C66/73921 (EP);
B29C65/3468 (US);
B29C65/344 (US);
B29C65/3448 (EP);
B29C66/1122 (EP);
B29C66/3472 (EP);
B29C66/54 (EP);
B29C66/721 (EP);
H05B3/20 (US);
B29C2793/009 (EP);
B29C65/3472 (EP);
B29C65/3492 (EP);
B29C66/7212 (EP);
B29K2105/167 (EP);
B29L2031/3076 (EP);
B29L2031/3082 (EP);
B29L2031/3085 (EP);
H05B2203/008 (US);
H05B2203/017 (US);
H05B2203/037 (US);
H05B2214/04 (US);
| C-Set: |
B29C66/7212, B29K2307/04 (EP);
B29C66/7212, B29K2309/08 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/38] |
Former [2023/09] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HEIZELEMENT UND SCHWEISSSATZ ZUM WIDERSTANDSSCHWEISSEN UND VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN EINES HEIZELEMENTES UND SCHWEISSEN VON THERMOPLASTISCHEN BAUTEILEN | [2023/09] | English: | HEATING ELEMENT AND WELDING KIT FOR RESISTANCE WELDING AND METHODS OF MANUFACTURING A HEATING ELEMENT AND WELDING THERMOPLASTIC COMPONENTS | [2023/09] | French: | ÉLÉMENT DE CHAUFFAGE ET KIT DE SOUDAGE POUR LE SOUDAGE PAR RÉSISTANCE ET PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION D'ÉLÉMENT DE CHAUFFAGE ET DE SOUDAGE DE COMPOSANTS THERMOPLASTIQUES | [2023/09] | Examination procedure | 17.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/38] | 17.08.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0633836 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]); | [XI]US5403993 (CORDIA JOHANNES MARIA [BE], et al); | [A]US2010084089 (WHEATON CHRISTOPHER SIMON COURTENAY [GB]) |