EP3974101 - RECONDITIONING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR RECONDITIONING TOOLS, TOOL HOLDERS AND / OR TOOL UNITS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.05.2024 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.09.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. Zoller GmbH & Co. KG Einstell- und Messgeräte Gottlieb-Daimler-Strasse 19 74385 Pleidelsheim / DE | [2022/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pfau, Christian 74379 Ingersheim / DE | 02 /
Zoller, Alexander 74385 Pleidelsheim / DE | 03 /
Reichardt, Andreas 74343 Sachsenheim / DE | [2022/13] | Representative(s) | Daub, Thomas Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Daub Bahnhofstrasse 5 88662 Überlingen / DE | [2022/13] | Application number, filing date | 21193095.3 | 25.08.2021 | [2022/13] | Priority number, date | DE202010125141 | 25.09.2020 Original published format: DE102020125141 | [2022/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3974101 | Date: | 30.03.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B23Q11/02, B23Q1/62, B23Q7/04, B08B1/00 | [2022/13] | CPC: |
B23Q11/02 (EP,US);
B23Q11/005 (US);
B08B3/022 (EP,US);
B23Q1/621 (EP,US);
B23Q17/2216 (US);
B23Q7/04 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/43] |
Former [2022/13] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WIEDERAUFBEREITUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR WIEDERAUFBEREITUNG VON WERKZEUGEN, WERKZEUGAUFNAHMEN UND/ODER WERKZEUGEINHEITEN | [2022/13] | English: | RECONDITIONING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR RECONDITIONING TOOLS, TOOL HOLDERS AND / OR TOOL UNITS | [2022/13] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE RETRAITEMENT ET PROCÉDÉ DE RETRAITEMENT PERMETTANT DE RETRAITER DES OUTILS, DES PORTE-OUTILS ET/OU DES UNITÉS D'OUTIL | [2022/13] | Examination procedure | 06.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.09.2022 | Examination requested [2022/43] | 21.09.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE102014103542 (KNOTH HUBERT [AT], et al) [Y] 10* claim 1 *; | [XAYI]DE102017119107 (E ZOLLER GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-3,5,8,9,22,24 * paragraph [0043]; figures 1, 2 * [A] 18 [Y] 10 [I] 4,6,7,11-17,19-21; | [X]DE202020100819U (AGILE WING SMART MFG CO LTD [TW]) [X] 1,23 * figures 1-8 * | by applicant | DE102019115607 |