EP3937332 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS TO INCREASE THE RELIABILITY AND THE SERVICE LIFE TIME OF PHOTOVOLTAIC (PV) MODULES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.12.2022 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SolarEdge Technologies Ltd. 1 HaMada Street 4673335 Herzeliya / IL | [2022/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOSCOVICH, Ilan 4673335 Herzeliya / IL | 02 /
HAR-SHAI, Liron 4673335 Herzeliya / IL | 03 /
GROSSBERG, Amir 4673335 Herzeliya / IL | 04 /
ATIAS, Matan 4673335 Herzeliya / IL | [2022/02] | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [2022/02] | Application number, filing date | 21193204.1 | 02.05.2019 | [2022/02] | Priority number, date | US201862669499P | 10.05.2018 Original published format: US 201862669499 P | [2022/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3937332 | Date: | 12.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H02J3/38, H01L31/02, H02S40/32, H02J3/40, H02J3/46, H02S40/30 | [2022/02] | CPC: |
H02S40/30 (EP,US);
H02J3/381 (EP,CN,US);
H02J1/08 (US);
H02J1/082 (US);
H02J3/40 (EP,US);
H02J3/466 (EP,US);
H02J2300/24 (EP,US);
H02J2300/26 (CN);
H02M1/322 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/02] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERHÖHUNG DER ZUVERLÄSSIGKEIT UND LEBENSDAUER VON FOTOVOLTAIKMODULEN | [2022/02] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS TO INCREASE THE RELIABILITY AND THE SERVICE LIFE TIME OF PHOTOVOLTAIC (PV) MODULES | [2022/02] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR AUGMENTER LA FIABILITÉ ET LA DURÉE DE VIE DE MODULES PHOTOVOLTAÏQUE (PV) | [2022/02] | Examination procedure | 26.08.2021 | Examination requested [2022/02] | 12.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.12.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.04.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP19172253.7 / EP3567692 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2010286840 (POWELL PHILLIP W [US], et al); | [I]EP2256918 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]); | [XAI]US2013063119 (LUBOMIRSKY VADIM [US]); | [I]WO2014152458 (DOMINION RESOURCES INC [US]); | [I]CN108011583 (SUNGROW POWER SUPPLY CO LTD) |