EP3967802 - CONSOLIDATED NONWOVEN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.02.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.11.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.09.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2022/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHMIDT, Henrik 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | 02 /
JESBERGER, Stefan 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | 03 /
HABECK, Thorsten 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2022/11] | Representative(s) | BASF IP Association Carl-Bosch-Straße 38 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2022/11] | Application number, filing date | 21194321.2 | 01.09.2021 | [2022/11] | Priority number, date | EP20200195705 | 11.09.2020 Original published format: EP 20195705 | [2022/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3967802 | Date: | 16.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3967802 | Date: | 29.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | D04H1/64, C08L29/04, C08L33/06, C08L33/08, C08L33/24, C09D129/04, D06N3/00, D06N5/00 | [2022/46] | CPC: |
D04H1/64 (EP,CN);
D04H1/587 (CN);
C08L33/26 (US);
C08L25/14 (EP,US);
C08L29/04 (US);
C08L3/02 (US);
C08L33/064 (EP);
C08L33/08 (EP,US);
C08L33/24 (EP);
C08L47/00 (EP);
C08L7/00 (EP);
C08L9/06 (EP);
C09D129/04 (EP);
D04H3/12 (CN);
D04H5/04 (CN);
D06N3/0011 (EP);
D06N5/003 (EP);
C08K2003/2206 (US);
| C-Set: |
C08L25/14, C08L29/04 (EP);
C08L25/14, C08L3/02, C08L29/04 (EP);
C08L33/064, C08L3/02, C08L29/04 (EP);
C08L33/08, C08L29/04 (EP);
C08L33/08, C08L3/02, C08L29/04 (EP);
C08L33/24, C08L29/04 (EP);
C08L33/24, C08L3/02, C08L29/04 (EP);
C08L47/00, C08L29/04 (EP);
C08L47/00, C08L3/02, C08L29/04 (EP);
C08L9/06, C08L3/04, C08L29/04 (EP); |
Former IPC [2022/11] | D04H1/64, C08L29/04, C08L33/06, D06N5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/43] |
Former [2022/11] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFESTIGTER VLIESSTOFF | [2022/11] | English: | CONSOLIDATED NONWOVEN | [2022/11] | French: | NON-TISSÉ CONSOLIDÉ | [2022/11] | Examination procedure | 16.09.2022 | Examination requested [2022/43] | 16.09.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.02.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 15.02.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.02.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/10] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.03.2023 | CZ | 29.03.2023 | DK | 29.03.2023 | EE | 29.03.2023 | ES | 29.03.2023 | FI | 29.03.2023 | HR | 29.03.2023 | LT | 29.03.2023 | LV | 29.03.2023 | MC | 29.03.2023 | PL | 29.03.2023 | RO | 29.03.2023 | RS | 29.03.2023 | SE | 29.03.2023 | SI | 29.03.2023 | SK | 29.03.2023 | SM | 29.03.2023 | NO | 29.06.2023 | GR | 30.06.2023 | IS | 29.07.2023 | PT | 31.07.2023 | IE | 01.09.2023 | LU | 01.09.2023 | BE | 30.09.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/33] | AT | 29.03.2023 | |
CZ | 29.03.2023 | ||
DK | 29.03.2023 | ||
EE | 29.03.2023 | ||
ES | 29.03.2023 | ||
FI | 29.03.2023 | ||
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
MC | 29.03.2023 | ||
PL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RO | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
SI | 29.03.2023 | ||
SK | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
IS | 29.07.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
IE | 01.09.2023 | ||
LU | 01.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/28] | AT | 29.03.2023 | |
CZ | 29.03.2023 | ||
DK | 29.03.2023 | ||
EE | 29.03.2023 | ||
ES | 29.03.2023 | ||
FI | 29.03.2023 | ||
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
MC | 29.03.2023 | ||
PL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RO | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
SI | 29.03.2023 | ||
SK | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
IS | 29.07.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
LU | 01.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/27] | AT | 29.03.2023 | |
CZ | 29.03.2023 | ||
DK | 29.03.2023 | ||
EE | 29.03.2023 | ||
ES | 29.03.2023 | ||
FI | 29.03.2023 | ||
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
PL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RO | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
SI | 29.03.2023 | ||
SK | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
IS | 29.07.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
LU | 01.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 29.03.2023 | |
CZ | 29.03.2023 | ||
DK | 29.03.2023 | ||
EE | 29.03.2023 | ||
ES | 29.03.2023 | ||
FI | 29.03.2023 | ||
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
PL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RO | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
SK | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
IS | 29.07.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 29.03.2023 | |
EE | 29.03.2023 | ||
ES | 29.03.2023 | ||
FI | 29.03.2023 | ||
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
PL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RO | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
SK | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
IS | 29.07.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 29.03.2023 | |
EE | 29.03.2023 | ||
ES | 29.03.2023 | ||
FI | 29.03.2023 | ||
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
RO | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 29.03.2023 | |
EE | 29.03.2023 | ||
ES | 29.03.2023 | ||
FI | 29.03.2023 | ||
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 29.03.2023 | |
FI | 29.03.2023 | ||
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | FI | 29.03.2023 | |
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | FI | 29.03.2023 | |
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | HR | 29.03.2023 | |
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | LT | 29.03.2023 | |
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | LT | 29.03.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2006082223 (BASF AG [DE], et al); | [AD]EP3299514 (JOHNS MANVILLE EUROPE GMBH [DE]) | by applicant | EP0114849 | DE4004915 | EP1114849 | EP1846524 | EP2580257 | EP2987827 | EP3299514 | WO2020EP60897 |