EP3958050 - POLYMERIC ION CONDUCTIVE ELECTROLYTE SHEET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.04.2024 Database last updated on 11.06.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.08.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huntsman International LLC 10003 Woodloch Forest Drive The Woodlands, TX 77380 / US | For all designated states Polyceed Inc. 4541 East Fort Lowell Road Tucson, AZ 85712 / US | [2024/18] |
Former [2022/08] | For all designated states Polyceed Inc. 4541 East Fort Lowell Road Tucson, AZ 85712 / US | ||
For all designated states Huntsman International LLC 10003 Woodloch Forest Drive The Woodlands, TX 77380 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AGRAWAL, Anoop Tucson, AZ 85718 / US | 02 /
ADAMS, Lori Tucson, AZ 85738 / US | 03 /
CRONIN, John, P. Tucson, AZ 85718 / US | 04 /
CAO, Lan Arlington, MA 02476 / US | 05 /
ARIS ZARIF, Farhana Mohd Dracut, MA 01826 / US | [2022/08] | Representative(s) | Lee, Alexander Mark Huntsman Surface Sciences UK Ltd. Concordia House Glenarm Road, Wynyard Business Park Billingham TS22 5FB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/08] | Van den Broeck, Kristel Alice, et al Huntsman (Europe) BVBA Intellectual Property Department Everslaan 45 3078 Everberg / BE | Application number, filing date | 21194384.0 | 15.07.2019 | [2022/08] | Priority number, date | US201862698284P | 16.07.2018 Original published format: US 201862698284 P | US201862729809P | 11.09.2018 Original published format: US 201862729809 P | US201862770964P | 23.11.2018 Original published format: US 201862770964 P | US201962807461P | 19.02.2019 Original published format: US 201962807461 P | US201962842404P | 02.05.2019 Original published format: US 201962842404 P | [2022/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3958050 | Date: | 23.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/15 | [2022/08] | CPC: |
E06B3/6612 (EP);
G02F1/15165 (US);
B32B17/10302 (US);
B32B17/10513 (US);
B32B7/12 (US);
C03C17/23 (US);
C08G18/242 (US);
C08G18/44 (US);
C08G18/73 (US);
C08J5/18 (EP,US);
C08K5/0016 (US);
C08K5/005 (US);
C09J153/00 (US);
E06B3/66366 (EP);
E06B3/6722 (EP);
E06B9/24 (EP,US);
G02F1/133305 (US);
G02F1/133502 (US);
G02F1/15 (US);
G02F1/1503 (US);
G02F1/1525 (EP,US);
G02F1/1533 (US);
G02F1/155 (US);
G02F1/161 (US);
H01B1/122 (EP,US);
H01M10/0565 (EP,US);
H01M4/13 (EP);
H01M4/62 (EP);
C03C2217/228 (US);
C03C2217/231 (US);
C03C2217/948 (US);
C08J2300/22 (US);
C08J2329/00 (US);
C08J2331/04 (US);
C08J2369/00 (US);
C08J2375/02 (US);
C08J2375/04 (EP,US);
C08K2201/001 (US);
C08K2201/011 (US);
E06B2003/6638 (EP);
E06B2009/2464 (EP,US);
G02F1/133325 (US);
G02F2001/1502 (US);
G02F2001/164 (EP,US);
G02F2201/44 (US);
H01M2300/0082 (EP);
Y02A30/249 (EP);
Y02B80/22 (EP);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/39] |
Former [2022/08] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | IONENLEITFÄHIGES ELEKTROLYT-POLYMER-BLATT | [2024/16] | English: | POLYMERIC ION CONDUCTIVE ELECTROLYTE SHEET | [2022/08] | French: | FEUILLE ELECTROLYTE POLYMERE CONDUCTRICE IONIQUE | [2024/14] |
Former [2022/08] | IONEN-LEITFÄHIGES ELEKTOLYT POLYMERBLATT | ||
Former [2022/08] | FEUILLE ELECTROLYTE POLYMÈRE CONDUCTRICE IONIQUE | Examination procedure | 22.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/39] | 23.08.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP19746336.7 / EP3824345 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US6087426 (HELMS JEFFREY HAMPTON [US], et al) [I] 1-7,12 * column 2 - column 5 *; | [A]KR20170111939 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0040] , [0042] *; | [AD]WO2018128906 (POLYCEED INC [US]) [AD] 1-12* paragraphs [000119] , [000120] * |