EP4144498 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR IMPREGNATING A SEMI-FINISHED FIBRE PRODUCT WITH A LIQUID MATRIX SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.07.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.09.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.02.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Universität Stuttgart Keplerstrasse 7 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [2023/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Engelfried, Mathias 70180 Stuttgart / DE | 02 /
Grisin, Benjamin 70180 Stuttgart / DE | [2023/10] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner mbB Kronenstraße 30 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [2023/10] | Application number, filing date | 21195135.5 | 06.09.2021 | [2023/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4144498 | Date: | 08.03.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B29B15/10 | [2023/10] | CPC: |
B29B15/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/41] |
Former [2023/10] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM TRÄNKEN EINES FASERHALBZEUGS MIT EINEM FLÜSSIGEN MATRIXSYSTEM | [2023/10] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR IMPREGNATING A SEMI-FINISHED FIBRE PRODUCT WITH A LIQUID MATRIX SYSTEM | [2023/10] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE TREMPAGE D'UN DEMI-PRODUIT FIBREUX DOTÉ D'UN SYSTÈME MATRICIEL LIQUIDE | [2023/10] | Examination procedure | 06.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.09.2023 | Examination requested [2023/41] | 06.09.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19637795 (ROTHENBERGER ROHRSANIERUNG GMB [DE]); | [XA]US6207002 (ODELL CLINTON KELLY [US], et al); | [AD]DE102017206999 (LNNFA GMBH [DE]) | by applicant | AU3086489 | EP0363794 | DE10013409 | EP1420940 | DE102017206999 |