EP3939911 - TRACK STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.01.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.09.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.07.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR, HR, RS | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ocado Innovation Limited The IP Department c/o Buildings One & Two Trident Place Mosquito Way Hatfield, Hertfordshire AL10 9UL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2024/26] | For all designated states Ocado Innovation Limited The IP Department c/o Buildings One & Two Trident Place, Mosquito Way Hatfield, Hertfordshire AL10 9UL / GB | ||
Former [2022/03] | For all designated states Ocado Innovation Limited 1 Trident Place Mosquito Way Hatfield, Hertfordshire AL10 9UL / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LINDBO, Lars Sverker Ture HATFIELD, AL10 9UL / GB | 02 /
CLARKE, Paul HATFIELD, AL10 9UL / GB | 03 /
INGRAM-TEDD, Andrew HATFIELD, AL10 9UL / GB | [2022/03] | Representative(s) | Ocado Group IP Department The IP Department c/o Buildings One & Two Trident Place Mosquito Way Hatfield, Hertfordshire AL10 9UL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/03] | Ocado Group IP Department The Legal Department 1 Trident Place Mosquito Way Hatfield AL10 9UL / GB | Application number, filing date | 21195203.1 | 16.05.2018 | [2022/03] | Priority number, date | GB20170007922 | 17.05.2017 Original published format: GB 201707922 | [2022/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3939911 | Date: | 19.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3939911 | Date: | 14.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B65G1/02, B65G1/04 | [2022/03] | CPC: |
B65G1/0464 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B65G1/02 (EP,GB,US);
B61B3/00 (US);
B65D19/385 (US);
B65G1/0478 (KR,US);
B65D2501/24554 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/34] |
Former [2022/03] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | GLEISSTRUKTUR | [2022/03] | English: | TRACK STRUCTURE | [2022/03] | French: | STRUCTURE DE PISTE | [2022/03] | Examination procedure | 18.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/34] | 18.07.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.08.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 11.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 10.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP18724889.3 / EP3625152 | Divisional application(s) | EP24150600.5 / EP4324768 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HR | 14.02.2024 | RS | 14.05.2024 | GR | 15.05.2024 | IS | 14.06.2024 | [2024/35] |
Former [2024/32] | IS | 14.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]GB2520104 (OCADO INNOVATION LTD [GB]); | [A]WO2016172793 (ATTABOTICS INC [CA]) | by applicant | US2701065 | EP0767113 | EP1037828 | NO317366B | GB2520104 | GB20130014313 |