EP4016598 - GUIDED VIAS IN MICROELECTRONIC STRUCTURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.12.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INTEL Corporation 2200 Mission College Blvd. Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2022/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Singh, Gurpreet Portland, 97229 / US | 02 /
Han, Eungnak Portland, 97229 / US | 03 /
Chen, Xuanxuan Hillsboro, 97124 / US | 04 /
Mahdi, Tayseer Beaverton, 97006 / US | 05 /
Krysak, Marie Portland, 97225 / US | 06 /
Holybee, Brandon Jay Portland, 97203 / US | 07 /
Gstrein, Florian Portland, 97212 / US | [2022/25] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2022/25] | Application number, filing date | 21195439.1 | 08.09.2021 | [2022/25] | Priority number, date | US202017125232 | 17.12.2020 Original published format: US202017125232 | [2022/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4016598 | Date: | 22.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/768, H01L23/522 | [2022/25] | CPC: |
H01L21/76885 (EP);
H01L23/5384 (US);
H01L21/76897 (EP);
H01L23/5226 (EP);
H01L23/5386 (US);
H01L21/76816 (EP);
H01L21/76883 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/03] |
Former [2022/25] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GEFÜHRTE DURCHGANGSLÖCHER IN MIKROELEKTRONISCHEN STRUKTUREN | [2022/25] | English: | GUIDED VIAS IN MICROELECTRONIC STRUCTURES | [2022/25] | French: | TROUS D'INTERCONNEXION GUIDÉS DANS DES STRUCTURES MICROÉLECTRONIQUES | [2022/25] | Examination procedure | 13.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/03] | 13.12.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH08130220 (NIPPON KOKAN KK) [X] 1,2,4-6,8-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0026] *; | [X]US5585675 (KNOPF GEORGE S [US]) [X] 1,4,5,8-11,13 * abstract *; | [X]US2006108680 (WU CHING-YUAN [TW], et al) [X] 1,4,13 * abstract *; | [X]US2011260288 (SUKEKAWA MITSUNARI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6,8-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0081] *; | [X]JP2011222796 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [X] 1,4,5,8-11,13-15 * abstract *; | [X]EP2426714 (FUJIKURA LTD [JP]) [X] 1,4,5,8-13 * abstract *; | [A]US2014127910 (HIENO ATSUSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [X]US2016035738 (KAKEGAWA TOMOYASU [JP], et al) [X] 1-11,13-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0069] *; | [X]US9613967 (CHIEN YI-HAO [TW], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * column 3, line 54 - line 58 *; | [A]WO2018231195 (INTEL CORP [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]WO2019190463 (INTEL CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-15* abstract * |