EP3967631 - VIBRATORY CONVEYOR WITH A ROTATIONALLY DRIVEN DRIVE MAGNET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.09.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Escha GmbH & Co. KG Elberfelder Straße 32 58553 Halver / DE | [2022/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MUNTEAN, Daniel 51688 Wipperfürth / DE | [2022/11] | Representative(s) | Grundmann, Dirk, et al Rieder & Partner mbB Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwalt Yale-Allee 26 42329 Wuppertal / DE | [2022/11] | Application number, filing date | 21195885.5 | 10.09.2021 | [2022/11] | Priority number, date | DE202010123907 | 14.09.2020 Original published format: DE102020123907 | [2022/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3967631 | Date: | 16.03.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B65G27/02, B65G27/18, B65G47/14 | [2022/11] | CPC: |
B65G47/1421 (EP);
B65G27/02 (EP);
B65G27/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/42] |
Former [2022/11] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHWINGFÖRDERER MIT EINEM DREHANGETRIEBENEN ANTRIEBSMAGNETEN | [2022/11] | English: | VIBRATORY CONVEYOR WITH A ROTATIONALLY DRIVEN DRIVE MAGNET | [2022/11] | French: | TRANSPORTEUR OSCILLANT DOTÉ D'UN AIMANT D'ENTRAÎNEMENT À ENTRAÎNEMENT ROTATIF | [2022/11] | Examination procedure | 07.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.09.2022 | Examination requested [2022/42] | 08.09.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JPH06321334 (CITIZEN WATCH CO LTD) [X] 1-7,9-12,14,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0022] * * figures 1-5 * [I] 8,13; | [X]JPH09142631 (SUMITOMO SPEC METALS) [X] 1,6,8,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0016] * * figures 1-3 *; | [X]JP2006240793 (SHINKO ELECTRIC CO LTD) [X] 1,6,8,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0044] ** figures 1-5 * | by applicant | AT255965B | DE202008006747U | DE102009015208 |