EP4147716 - ANTI-VIRUS MOIETY IMMOBILISED IN A MATRIX [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 28.07.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.02.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.07.2023 | Refusal of application | published on 30.08.2023 [2023/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samatva Research Corporation 1265 Arthur Street, Suite 601 Thunder Bay, Ontario P7E 6E7 / CA | [2023/11] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [2023/11] | Application number, filing date | 21195979.6 | 10.09.2021 | [2023/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4147716 | Date: | 15.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/12, C07K16/10 | [2023/11] | CPC: |
A61K39/12 (EP,US);
C07K16/1003 (EP,US);
A61K2039/505 (EP);
C07K2319/20 (EP);
C07K2319/21 (EP);
C07K2319/23 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | IN EINER MATRIX IMMOBILISIERTE ANTI-VIRUS KOMPONENTE | [2023/11] | English: | ANTI-VIRUS MOIETY IMMOBILISED IN A MATRIX | [2023/11] | French: | COMPOSANT ANTI-VIRUS IMMOBILISÉ DANS UNE MATRICE | [2023/11] | Examination procedure | 23.03.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2023/35] | 02.04.2023 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2023/35] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2005012360 (CRUCELL HOLLAND BV [NL], et al); | [XY]JP5075554B ; | [Y]CN103755815 (USTC UNIV SCIENCE TECH CN); | [Y]CN112574299 (SUZHOU FUNC BIO TECH CO LTD, et al); |