EP3955505 - ELECTRONIC EQUIPMENT IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM AND WIRELESS COMMUNICATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.01.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.09.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Group Corporation 1-7-1, Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2022/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HU, Bingshan Beijing, 100028 / CN | 02 /
SUN, Chen Beijing, 100028 / CN | 03 /
WEI, Yuxin Beijing, 100028 / CN | 04 /
CHEN, Jinhui Beijing, 100028 / CN | 05 /
GUO, Xin Beijing, 100028 / CN | 06 /
LU, Penshun Beijing, 100028 / CN | [2022/07] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/07] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 21196064.6 | 24.09.2015 | [2022/07] | Priority number, date | CN201510498448 | 13.08.2015 Original published format: CN201510498448 | [2022/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3955505 | Date: | 16.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04L5/00 | [2022/07] | CPC: |
H04L5/0098 (EP,US);
H04L5/0091 (CN);
H04W16/14 (US);
H04L5/0058 (CN,US);
H04L27/0006 (EP,US);
H04L5/001 (EP,US);
H04L5/0053 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/07] | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE AUSRÜSTUNG IN DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM UND DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN | [2022/07] | English: | ELECTRONIC EQUIPMENT IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM AND WIRELESS COMMUNICATION METHOD | [2022/07] | French: | DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL | [2022/07] | Examination procedure | 26.09.2021 | Examination requested [2022/07] | 29.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15900854.9 / EP3324566 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2015066343 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [A] 1-12 * page 2, paragraph 0003 - paragraph 0005 *; | [XI] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; Study on Licensed-Assisted Access to Unlicensed Spectrum; (Release 13)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TR 36.889, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20150618), vol. RAN WG1, no. V13.0.0, pages 1 - 87, XP050965916 [X] 1,10-12 * page 43, paragraph first * [I] 2-9 | [A] - NOKIA NETWORKS, "On design options for LAA LBT enabling frequency reuse", vol. RAN WG1, no. Fukuoka, Japan; 20150525 - 20150529, (20150524), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-152812 LAA REUSE 1, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20150524), XP050970019 [A] 1-12 * figures 1-3 * |