EP4016592 - MICROELECTRONIC STRUCTURES INCLUDING BRIDGES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.12.2022 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2022/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Karhade, Omkar G. Chandler, 85248 / US | 02 /
Deshpande, Nitin A. Chandler, 85286 / US | [2022/25] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2022/25] | Application number, filing date | 21196457.2 | 14.09.2021 | [2022/25] | Priority number, date | US202017126502 | 18.12.2020 Original published format: US202017126502 | [2022/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4016592 | Date: | 22.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/60, H01L21/98, H01L25/065, H01L23/498 | [2022/25] | CPC: |
H01L25/0652 (EP,US);
H01L23/49838 (CN);
H01L23/5383 (EP,US);
H01L21/4857 (US);
H01L23/13 (EP);
H01L23/4924 (CN);
H01L23/49822 (US);
H01L23/528 (CN);
H01L24/13 (EP,US);
H01L24/17 (EP);
H01L24/19 (EP);
H01L24/81 (US);
H01L24/96 (EP);
H01L25/04 (CN);
H01L25/0655 (EP,US);
H01L25/50 (EP);
H01L2224/0401 (EP);
H01L2224/04105 (EP);
H01L2224/0603 (EP);
H01L2224/06181 (EP);
H01L2224/12105 (EP);
H01L2224/131 (EP);
H01L2224/13111 (EP);
H01L2224/13139 (EP);
H01L2224/13147 (EP);
H01L2224/1403 (EP);
H01L2224/16145 (EP);
H01L2224/16227 (EP);
H01L2224/16235 (EP);
H01L2224/16237 (EP);
H01L2224/1703 (EP);
H01L2224/17181 (EP);
H01L2224/214 (EP);
H01L2224/2518 (EP);
H01L2224/32145 (EP);
H01L2224/32225 (EP);
H01L2224/73204 (EP);
H01L2224/73253 (EP);
H01L2224/73259 (EP);
H01L2224/81005 (EP);
H01L2224/81191 (EP);
H01L2224/81192 (EP);
H01L2224/81193 (EP);
H01L2224/81203 (US);
H01L2224/8181 (EP);
H01L2224/81815 (EP);
H01L2224/92125 (EP);
H01L2224/92242 (EP);
H01L2225/06513 (EP);
H01L2225/06517 (EP);
H01L23/49816 (EP);
H01L24/14 (EP);
H01L24/16 (EP);
H01L2924/10253 (EP);
H01L2924/1431 (EP);
H01L2924/1434 (EP);
H01L2924/15153 (EP);
H01L2924/15192 (EP);
H01L2924/15311 (EP);
H01L2924/15313 (EP);
H01L2924/18161 (EP);
H01L2924/18162 (EP);
H01L2924/19041 (EP);
H01L2924/19042 (EP);
H01L2924/19043 (EP);
H01L2924/19105 (EP);
H01L2924/19106 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/13111, H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2224/13139, H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2224/13147, H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2224/131, H01L2924/014, H01L2924/00014 (EP); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/02] |
Former [2022/25] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MIKROELEKTRONISCHE STRUKTUREN MIT BRÜCKEN | [2022/25] | English: | MICROELECTRONIC STRUCTURES INCLUDING BRIDGES | [2022/25] | French: | STRUCTURES MICROÉLECTRONIQUES COMPRENANT DES PONTS | [2022/25] | Examination procedure | 07.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/02] | 07.12.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2012104624 (CHOI DAESIK [KR], et al) [X] 1-6,9,11,12 * paragraphs [0045] , [0 52] , [0 56]; figures 4,5,7-9 *; | [X]US2012205789 (NATSUAKI MASANORI [JP], et al) [X] 3,8,11* paragraphs [0048] , [0122] , [0134]; figures 21c,26a,26b *; | [X]US2020266184 (PIETAMBARAM SRINIVAS [US], et al) [X] 1,5,7-15 * paragraphs [0011] - [0014] - [0017] , [0019] , [0022] , [0042]; figures 1a,1b *; | [X]US2020343184 (FUJISHIMA HIROYUKI [TW], et al) [X] 1-6,8,11,13 * paragraphs [0020] , [0032] , [0033]; figures 2-4 * |