EP4020222 - RANGE BASED FLUSHING MECHANISM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.12.2022 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2022/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nallluri, Hema Chand 560068 Bengaluru / IN | 02 /
Navale, Aditya Folsom, 95630 / US | 03 /
Koker, Altug El Dorado Hills, 95762 / US | 04 /
Fliflet, Brandon El Dorado Hills, 95762 / US | 05 /
Boles, Jeffery S. Folsom, 95630 / US | 06 /
Valerio, James North Plains, 97133 / US | 07 /
Ranganathan, Vasanth El Dorado Hills, 95762 / US | 08 /
Kundu, Anirban 560067 Bangalore / IN | 09 /
K, Pattabhiraman 560064 Bangalore / IN | [2022/26] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J., et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2022/26] | Application number, filing date | 21196646.0 | 14.09.2021 | [2022/26] | Priority number, date | US202017132147 | 23.12.2020 Original published format: US202017132147 | [2022/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4020222 | Date: | 29.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06F12/0804, G06F12/0875, G06F12/126, G06T1/20, G06T1/60, G06F12/084, G06F12/0842, // G06F12/0811 | [2022/26] | CPC: |
G06F12/126 (EP);
G06F9/5038 (CN);
G06F12/0802 (US);
G06F12/0804 (EP);
G06F12/084 (EP);
G06F12/0842 (EP);
G06F9/505 (CN);
G06T1/20 (CN);
G06T1/60 (CN);
G06F12/0811 (EP);
G06F12/0875 (EP);
G06F2209/5021 (CN);
G06F2212/1008 (EP);
G06F2212/1016 (EP);
G06F2212/1048 (EP);
G06F2212/302 (EP);
G06F2212/455 (EP);
G06F2212/681 (US);
Y02D10/00 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/01] |
Former [2022/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEREICHSBASIERTER SPÜLMECHANISMUS | [2022/26] | English: | RANGE BASED FLUSHING MECHANISM | [2022/26] | French: | MÉCANISME DE CHASSE D'EAU À BASE DE PORTÉE | [2022/26] | Examination procedure | 29.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/01] | 29.11.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2012133964 (HAYAKAWA MICHIO [JP]) [X] 1-3,7-12,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0058] * * paragraph [0081] - paragraph [0098] * * paragraph [0146] - paragraph [0223] * * figures 1, 2, 11, 20 * [I] 4-6,13,14; | [A]US2020286201 (VALERIO JAMES [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [ 143] - [0163] ** figures 16A, 16B, 17, 18 *; | [A] - YU QI ET AL, "HPE: Hierarchical Page Eviction Policy for Unified Memory in GPUs", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMPUTER-AIDED DESIGN OF INTEGRATED CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS, IEEE, USA, vol. 39, no. 10, doi:10.1109/TCAD.2019.2944790, ISSN 0278-0070, (20191004), pages 2461 - 2474, (20200922), XP011810877 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 2466, column le, line 16 - page 2467, column ri, line 40 * * figure 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TCAD.2019.2944790 |