EP3975204 - LIQUID WIRE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.01.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.12.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.07.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.04.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.10.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Liquid Wire Inc. 8240 SW Nimbus Avenue Beaverton, OR 97008 / US | [2022/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RONAY, Mark Hillsboro, 97124 / US | [2022/13] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/13] | Secerna LLP The Old Fire Station 18 Clifford Street York YO1 9RD / GB | Application number, filing date | 21196700.5 | 27.02.2017 | [2022/13] | Priority number, date | US201662301622P | 29.02.2016 Original published format: US 201662301622 P | [2022/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3975204 | Date: | 30.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3975204 | Date: | 12.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01B1/02, H01B1/16, H01B13/00, H05K1/09, H05K3/10 | [2022/13] | CPC: |
H01B1/02 (EP);
H01B1/16 (EP);
H05K1/09 (EP);
H05K2203/128 (EP);
H05K3/101 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/45] |
Former [2022/13] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | FLÜSSIGDRAHT | [2022/13] | English: | LIQUID WIRE | [2022/13] | French: | FIL À BASE DE LIQUIDE | [2022/13] | Examination procedure | 30.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.09.2022 | Examination requested [2022/45] | 30.09.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.04.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 06.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 08.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 03.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17760557.3 / EP3424053 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2594987 (DELPHI TECH INC [US]); | [A]US2015270089 (GHANEA-HERCOCK ROBERT [GB]); | [A]US2016049227 (BOTTIGLIO REBECCA KRAMER [US], et al); |