EP3965367 - DATA TRANSMISSION METHOD, TERMINAL DEVICE, AND NETWORK DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.04.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.09.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.04.2023 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.05.2023 [2023/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2022/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANG, Hai Dongguan, 523860 / CN | [2022/10] | Representative(s) | RGTH Patentanwälte PartGmbB Neuer Wall 10 20354 Hamburg / DE | [2022/10] | Application number, filing date | 21196875.5 | 20.10.2017 | [2022/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3965367 | Date: | 09.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/14, H04M15/00, H04W4/24, H04W76/12, // H04W76/15, H04W76/18 | [2022/10] | CPC: |
H04W76/12 (EP,RU,US);
H04W76/10 (CN,KR);
H04W80/10 (KR,US);
H04L12/14 (EP);
H04L12/1407 (EP,RU);
H04M15/66 (EP,RU,US);
H04M15/8228 (EP);
H04W4/24 (EP);
H04W40/02 (US);
H04W40/248 (US);
H04W48/18 (US);
H04W72/56 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/42] |
Former [2022/10] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | DATENÜBERTRAGUNGSVERFAHREN, ENDGERÄTEVORRICHTUNG UND NETZWERKVORRICHTUNG | [2022/10] | English: | DATA TRANSMISSION METHOD, TERMINAL DEVICE, AND NETWORK DEVICE | [2022/10] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSMISSION DE DONNÉES, DISPOSITIF TERMINAL ET DISPOSITIF DE RÉSEAU | [2022/10] | Examination procedure | 09.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.09.2022 | Examination requested [2022/42] | 09.09.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.04.2023 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2023/21] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17928855.0 / EP3700268 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Services and System Aspects; System Architecture for the 5G System; Stage 2 (Release 15)", 3GPP STANDARD ; TECHNICAL SPECIFICATION ; 3GPP TS 23.501, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20170909), vol. SA WG2, no. V1.3.0, pages 1 - 176, XP051336907 [X] 1,3-9,11-15 * paragraph [5.15.5.2] - paragraph [5.15.5.3] * * paragraph [A.3.1.8.1] - paragraph [A.3.1.8.3] * [A] 2,10 | [XA] - OPPO, "Updating for clause 6.1.2.2 in TS 23503", vol. SA WG2, no. Ljubljana, Slovenia; 20171023 - 20171027, (20171017), 3GPP DRAFT; S2-176999-UPDATING FOR CLAUSE 6.1.2.2 IN TS 23503 P-CR, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRA, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_sa/WG2_Arch/TSGS2_123_Ljubljana/Docs/, (20171017), XP051359695 [X] 1,3-9,11-15 * the whole document * [A] 2,10 | by applicant | EP20170928855 |