EP3971438 - BRAKE ASSEMBLY AND METHOD OF ADJUSTMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.04.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.02.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.11.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.09.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.09.2024 | New entry: Payment of fee for grant | 02.09.2024 | New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ArvinMeritor Technology, LLC 2135 West Maple Road Troy, MI 48084 / US | [2022/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Philpott, Daniel Troy, 48084 / US | 02 /
Bellemore, Brian Pointe-Aux-Roches, N0R 1N0 / CA | [2022/12] | Representative(s) | Whitfield, Jack Stephen Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [2022/12] | Application number, filing date | 21196966.2 | 15.09.2021 | [2022/12] | Priority number, date | US202017025869 | 18.09.2020 Original published format: US202017025869 | [2022/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3971438 | Date: | 23.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F16D65/00, F16D65/56 | [2022/12] | CPC: |
F16D65/567 (EP,US);
F16D55/2265 (US);
F16D65/0043 (EP);
F16D65/0068 (US);
F16D65/18 (US);
F16D2121/14 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/43] |
Former [2022/12] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BREMSANLAGE UND VERFAHREN ZUR EINSTELLUNG | [2022/12] | English: | BRAKE ASSEMBLY AND METHOD OF ADJUSTMENT | [2022/12] | French: | ENSEMBLE FREIN ET PROCÉDÉ DE RÉGLAGE | [2022/12] | Examination procedure | 22.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.09.2022 | Examination requested [2022/43] | 22.09.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 19.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 19.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3900084 (FARR GLYN PHILLIP REGINALD) [A] 1-15 * Fig. 1; col. 3, l. 34-40 *; | [A]US4159754 (AIRHEART FRANKLIN B, et al) [A] 1-15* Fig. 3; col. 3, l. 43-48 *; | [A]GB2097497 (KELSEY HAYES CO) [A] 1-15 * Fig. 1-2; p. 2, l. 50-60, p. 2, l. 111 - p. 3, l. 2, p. 3, l. 104 - p. 4, l. 33 *; | [A]US4491203 (MONICK FREDERICK R [US]) [A] 1-15 * Fig. 1; col. 3, l. 49-68, col. 6, l. 29-44 *; | [A]GB2192033 (TEVES GMBH ALFRED) [A] 1-15 * Fig. 1-5; p. 5, l. 68-72 * | by applicant | US2019024740 |