EP3971434 - COUPLING AND ASSOCIATED METHOD OF TRANSFERRING TORQUE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.12.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.10.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.09.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PRATT & WHITNEY CANADA CORP. 1000 Marie Victorin, (01BE5) Longueuil, Québec J4G 1A1 / CA | [2022/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALECU, Daniel (01BE5) Longueuil, J4G 1A1 / CA | 02 /
CONCIATORI, Michael (01BE5) Longueuil, J4G 1A1 / CA | [2022/12] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2022/12] | Application number, filing date | 21196997.7 | 15.09.2021 | [2022/12] | Priority number, date | US202017022203 | 16.09.2020 Original published format: US202017022203 | [2022/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3971434 | Date: | 23.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3971434 | Date: | 15.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F16D3/62 | [2022/12] | CPC: |
F16D3/62 (EP);
F02C7/36 (US);
F05D2220/76 (US);
F05D2260/40 (US);
F05D2300/171 (US);
F05D2300/434 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/44] |
Former [2022/12] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | KUPPLUNG UND ZUGEHÖRIGES VERFAHREN ZUR DREHMOMENTÜBERTRAGUNG | [2022/12] | English: | COUPLING AND ASSOCIATED METHOD OF TRANSFERRING TORQUE | [2022/12] | French: | COUPLAGE ET PROCÉDÉ ASSOCIÉ DE TRANSFERT DE COUPLE | [2022/12] | Examination procedure | 23.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.09.2022 | Examination requested [2022/44] | 23.09.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.10.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 05.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR1446757 (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE) [X] 1,2,13,15* figure - *; | [X]US5573461 (COLFORD TERRY [GB]) [X] 1-3,7,8,13,15 * figure - *; | [XAI]US2016298603 (GUERN PIERRE [GB], et al) [X] 1,2,13,15 * paragraphs [0113] - [0120]; figure 3 * [A] 3-12 [I] 14 |