EP3954238 - APPARATUS FOR HEATING SMOKABLE MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.11.2022 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nicoventures Trading Limited Globe House 1 Water Street London WC2R 3LA / GB | [2022/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAUGHTON, Michael Oconomowoc, 53066 / US | 02 /
THORSEN, Mitchel Madison, 53718 / US | [2022/07] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2022/07] | Application number, filing date | 21197532.1 | 24.06.2016 | [2022/07] | Priority number, date | US201562185227P | 26.06.2015 Original published format: US 201562185227 P | [2022/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3954238 | Date: | 16.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3954238 | Date: | 11.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A24F40/85, A24F40/40 | [2022/07] | CPC: |
A24F40/40 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A24F47/00 (KR,RU);
A24F40/46 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A24F40/20 (EP,KR,US);
A24F40/42 (KR);
A24F40/48 (KR);
A24F40/85 (EP,CN,KR);
B65D25/38 (KR);
F16L59/147 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/49] |
Former [2022/07] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERWÄRMUNG VON RAUCHBAREM MATERIAL | [2022/07] | English: | APPARATUS FOR HEATING SMOKABLE MATERIAL | [2022/07] | French: | APPAREIL DE CHAUFFAGE DE MATÉRIAU À FUMER | [2022/07] | Examination procedure | 31.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.10.2022 | Examination requested [2022/49] | 31.10.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16738688.7 / EP3313217 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19854009 (REEMTSMA H F & PH [DE]); | [A]WO0027232 (PHILIP MORRIS INC [US]); | [A]WO2013160112 (BRITISH AMERICAN TOBACCO CO [GB]) |