EP3975394 - DRIVING UNIT FOR A TUNNEL THRUSTER AND A TUNNEL THRUSTER WITH SUCH DRIVING UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.11.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.04.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Correction of patent specification | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nakev, Plamen Iordanov 40 Iliyantsi Blvd. 1220 Sofia / BG | [N/P] |
Former [2024/20] | For all designated states Nakev, Plamen Lordanov 40 Iliyantsi Blvd. 1220 Sofia / BG | ||
Former [2022/13] | For all designated states Plamen Iordanov Nakev 40 Iliyantsi Blvd. 1220 Sofia / BG | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2022/13] | Representative(s) | Benatov, Samuil Gabriel Dr. EMIL BENATOV & PARTNERS 6, Asen Peykov Str. 1113 Sofia / BG | [2022/13] | Application number, filing date | 21197631.1 | 20.09.2021 | [2022/13] | Priority number, date | EP20200472012 | 28.09.2020 Original published format: EP 20472012 | [2022/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3975394 | Date: | 30.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3975394 | Date: | 15.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/20] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP3975394 | Date: | 29.05.2024 | [2024/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H02K11/33, H02K9/22, H02K7/14, B63H25/42, B63H21/17 | [2022/13] | CPC: |
H02K11/33 (EP);
B63H21/17 (EP,US);
B63H1/16 (US);
B63H21/38 (US);
B63H25/42 (EP);
B63H25/46 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/18] |
Former [2022/13] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ANTRIEBSEINHEIT FÜR EIN TUNNELSTRAHLRUDER UND TUNNELSTRAHLRUDER MIT EINEM SOLCHEN ANTRIEBSEINHEIT | [2022/13] | English: | DRIVING UNIT FOR A TUNNEL THRUSTER AND A TUNNEL THRUSTER WITH SUCH DRIVING UNIT | [2022/13] | French: | UNITÉ D'ENTRAÎNEMENT POUR UN PROPULSEUR DE TUNNEL ET PROPULSEUR DE TUNNEL DOTÉ D'UNE TELLE UNITÉ D'ENTRAÎNEMENT | [2022/13] | Examination procedure | 28.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/18] | 28.03.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 07.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 12.04.2024 | Request for correction of the decision to grant filed | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5674056 (YAMAMOTO MASAKAZU [JP], et al); | [I]US5704306 (DEN OUDEN WILLEM HENDRIK [BE]); | [A]US2012229005 (TOMINAGA TSUTOMU [JP], et al); | [A]US2018134355 (SUZUKI TAKAYOSHI [JP], et al); | [A]FR3091066 (STIGA S P A IN BREVE ANCHE ST S P A [IT]) | Examination | US2017137099 | US2018229825 |