EP3951869 - ILLUMINATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.08.2022 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Epistar Corporation 21, Li-hsin Rd. Science-based Industrial Park Hsinchu 300 / TW | [2022/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pan, Shyi-Ming Tao-Yuan Hsien / TW | 02 /
Cheng, Wei-Kang Tao-Yuan Hsien / TW | 03 /
Huang, Chih-Shu Tao-Yuan Hsien / TW | 04 /
Lee, Chen-Hong Tao-Yuan Hsien / TW | 05 /
Yeh, Shih-Yu Tao-Yuan Hsien / TW | 06 /
Pu, Chi-Chih Tao-Yuan Hsien / TW | 07 /
Yang, Cheng-Kuang Tao-Yuan Hsien / TW | 08 /
Tang, Shih-Chieh Tao-Yuan Hsien / TW | 09 /
Hong, Siang-Fu Tao-Yuan Hsien / TW | 10 /
Wang, Tzu-Hsiang Tao-Yuan Hsien / TW | [2022/06] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | [2022/06] | Application number, filing date | 21197696.4 | 29.05.2013 | [2022/06] | Priority number, date | TW20120119098 | 29.05.2012 Original published format: TW 101119098 | TW20120121921 | 19.06.2012 Original published format: TW 101121921 | TW20120125599 | 16.07.2012 Original published format: TW 101125599 | TW20120131198 | 28.08.2012 Original published format: TW 101131198 | TW20120131643 | 30.08.2012 Original published format: TW 101131643 | TW20120132185 | 04.09.2012 Original published format: TW 101132185 | TW20120132187 | 04.09.2012 Original published format: TW 101132187 | TW20130116429 | 08.05.2013 Original published format: TW 102116429 | TW20130116650 | 10.05.2013 Original published format: TW 102116650 | [2022/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3951869 | Date: | 09.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01L25/075, H01L33/48, F21K99/00, H01L27/15, H01L33/08, // H01L33/00, H01L33/50, H01L33/58, H01L33/60, H01L33/62, H01L33/64, F21Y107/00, F21Y107/50, F21Y109/00, F21Y115/10, H01L23/00 | [2022/06] | CPC: |
H01L25/0753 (EP,US);
H01L33/02 (KR);
H01L33/505 (EP,CN,KR,US);
F21V21/14 (US);
F21K9/20 (US);
F21K9/232 (EP,US);
F21K9/235 (KR);
F21K9/237 (KR);
F21V15/01 (KR);
F21V17/10 (US);
F21V21/00 (US);
F21V21/002 (US);
F21V23/06 (US);
F21V29/85 (US);
F21V3/02 (US);
H01L27/156 (EP,KR,US);
H01L33/08 (US);
H01L33/20 (KR,US);
H01L33/36 (KR);
H01L33/44 (EP,US);
H01L33/48 (US);
H01L33/486 (EP,US);
H01L33/50 (US);
H01L33/507 (EP,US);
H01L33/508 (US);
H01L33/54 (CN);
H01L33/62 (EP,KR,US);
F21K9/27 (EP,US);
F21K9/65 (EP,US);
F21Y2107/00 (EP,US);
F21Y2107/50 (EP,US);
F21Y2109/00 (EP,US);
F21Y2115/10 (EP,US);
H01L2224/0401 (US);
H01L2224/04026 (US);
H01L2224/04042 (US);
H01L2224/05554 (US);
H01L2224/06102 (US);
H01L2224/06181 (US);
H01L2224/131 (US);
H01L2224/13109 (US);
H01L2224/13144 (US);
H01L2224/1329 (US);
H01L2224/13339 (US);
H01L2224/14 (US);
H01L2224/1403 (EP,US);
H01L2224/14051 (EP,US);
H01L2224/16 (EP,US);
H01L2224/16225 (EP,US);
H01L2224/2919 (US);
H01L2224/32225 (EP,US);
H01L2224/45099 (US);
H01L2224/45124 (EP);
H01L2224/45147 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48091 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48137 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48227 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48465 (EP,US);
H01L2224/49107 (EP,US);
H01L2224/73204 (EP,US);
H01L2224/73265 (EP,US);
H01L2224/81805 (US);
H01L2224/83385 (EP,US);
H01L2224/83493 (US);
H01L2224/8592 (EP,US);
H01L24/06 (US);
H01L24/13 (US);
H01L24/14 (EP,US);
H01L24/16 (EP,US);
H01L24/29 (US);
H01L24/32 (US);
H01L24/45 (US);
H01L24/48 (EP,US);
H01L24/49 (EP,US);
H01L24/73 (US);
H01L24/81 (US);
H01L24/83 (US);
H01L2924/00011 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01322 (EP,US);
H01L2924/12041 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/131, H01L2924/014 (US);
H01L2224/45124, H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2224/45147, H01L2924/00 (US);
H01L2224/45147, H01L2924/00011 (US);
H01L2224/45147, H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/48465, H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48465, H01L2224/48227, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2224/73204, H01L2224/16225, H01L2224/32225, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2224/73265, H01L2224/32225, H01L2224/48227, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2924/00011, H01L2924/01005 (US);
H01L2924/00011, H01L2924/01015 (US,EP);
H01L2924/00011, H01L2924/01033 (US);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/13099 (US,EP);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/45099 (US,EP);
H01L2924/01322, H01L2924/00 (EP,US); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/37] |
Former [2022/06] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | BELEUCHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2022/06] | English: | ILLUMINATION DEVICE | [2022/06] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ÉCLAIRAGE | [2022/06] | Examination procedure | 08.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/37] | 08.08.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP13169790.6 / EP2669946 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 22.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 22.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2007139949 (TANDA YUICHIRO [JP], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0081] * * figures 1-16 *; | [A]US2011163683 (STEELE ROBERT [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0068] - paragraph [0161] ** figures 1-30 *; | [IY]CN102130239 (RONGBIN ZHENG) [I] 1-14 * abstract * [Y] 15; | [IY]KR20110099513 (SAMSUNG LED CO LTD [KR]) [I] 1 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0077] * * figures 1-16 * [Y] 15; | [P]EP2482347 (CHENG YUNG PUN [CN]) [P] * abstract * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0041] * * figures 1-5 * |