EP3950049 - AN ANTI-INFLAMMATORY AGENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2022/06] | USE OF AN ANTI-INFLAMMATORY AGENT | ||
[2023/41] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.09.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.08.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Galvani Bioelectronics Limited 980 Great West Road Brentford Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | For all designated states Academisch Medisch Centrum Meibergdreef 9 1105 AZ Amsterdam / NL | [2022/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEW, Daniel John Hertfordshire, SG1 2NY / GB | 02 /
DE JONGE, Wouter Jacob 1105 AZ Amsterdam / NL | 03 /
FAMM, Hans Jakob Kristoffer Hertfordshire, SG1 2NY / GB | 04 /
PATEL, Sonal 4052 Basel / CH | 05 /
WELTING, Olaf 1105 AZ Amsterdam / NL | [2022/06] | Representative(s) | de Pauw, Elmar Sebastian David Schenklaan 5 2497 AV Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2022/06] | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 21197806.9 | 22.04.2016 | [2022/06] | Priority number, date | US201562152119P | 24.04.2015 Original published format: US 201562152119 P | [2022/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3950049 | Date: | 09.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/05, A61P29/00, // A61N1/36 | [2022/06] | CPC: |
A61N1/0551 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61N1/3605 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61N1/36007 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K31/56 (KR);
A61K38/13 (KR);
A61N1/0556 (EP,CN,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/37] |
Former [2022/06] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EIN ENTZÜNDUNGSHEMMMITTEL | [2023/41] | English: | AN ANTI-INFLAMMATORY AGENT | [2023/41] | French: | UN AGENT ANTI-INFLAMMATOIRE | [2023/41] |
Former [2022/06] | VERWENDUNG EINES ENTZÜNDUNGSHEMMMITTELS | ||
Former [2022/06] | USE OF AN ANTI-INFLAMMATORY AGENT | ||
Former [2022/06] | UTILISATION D'UN AGENT ANTI-INFLAMMATOIRE | Examination procedure | 09.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/37] | 09.08.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.02.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/27] | 28.02.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2024/27] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16721943.5 / EP3285856 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2005075702 (SHAFER LISA LYNN [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [61.92] - [0094] *; | [A]WO2008096730 (UNIV NAGOYA NAT UNIV CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2008215101 (REZAI ALI [US], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0022] , [0030] - [0032] *; | [A]US2010174339 (PYLES STEPHEN T [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0041] , [0070] , [0071] * | by applicant | US7389145 | US8731676 | - BOROVIKOVA, Nature, (20000000), vol. 405, pages 458 - 462 | - HUSTON, J. Exp. Med, (20060000), vol. 2, no. 03, pages 1623 - 1628 | - VIDA, Immunol, (20110000), vol. 186, pages 4340 - 4346 | - JI et al., Muc Immunol, vol. 2, page 014 | - FRIEDA A. KOOPMAN, "Pilot Study of Stimulation of the Cholinergic Anti-Inflammatory Pathway with an Implantable Vagus Nerve Stimulation Device in Patients with Rheumatoid Arthritis", Arthritis & Rheumatism, (20121000), vol. 64, no. 10, page S195 | - TERUO NAKAYAMAH. T. HAMMELJ. D. HARDYJ. S. EISENMAN, American Journal of Physiology, (19630601), vol. 204, pages 1122 - 1126 | - EOM K, Small, (20141015), vol. 10, no. 19, pages 3853 - 7 | - HENG HUANG, Nature Nanotechnology, (20100000), vol. 5, pages 602 - 606 | - J. A. GALBRAITH, J Biomech Eng, (19930201), vol. 115, no. 1, pages 13 - 22 | - KING, R, Ultrasound Med. Biol., (20140700), vol. 40, page l512 | - MENZ, MD, J Neurosci., (20130306), vol. 33, no. 10, pages 4550 - 60 | - L.R. GAVRILOV, Ultrasound Med Biol, (19960000), vol. 22, pages 179 - 192 | - BACHTOLD, M., Ultrasound Med Biol., (19980500), vol. 24, no. 4, pages 557 - 65 | - PATBERG, "Blocking of impulse conduction in peripheral nerves by local cooling as a routine in animal experimentation", Journal of Neuroscience Methods, (19840000), vol. 10, doi:10.1016/0165-0270(84)90019-0, pages 267 - 75, XP024323004 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0165-0270(84)90019-0 | - DUKE, J Neural Eng, (20120000), vol. 9, no. 3, page 036003 | - Nat Neurosci., (20130700), vol. 16, no. 7, pages 816 - 23 | - ROBERT FERNP. J. HARRISON, "The effects of compression upon conduction in myelinated axons of the isolated frog sciatic nerve", Br.j. Anaesth., (19750000), vol. 47, page 1123 | - BHADRAKILGORE, IEEE Transactions on Neural systems and rehabilitation engineering, (20040000), vol. 12, no. 3, pages 313 - 324 | - BHADRA, N., Journal of Computational Neuroscience, (20070000), vol. 22, no. 3, pages 313 - 326 |