EP3978285 - METHOD FOR MANAGING A CHARGE LEVEL OF AN ELECTRICAL ENERGY STORAGE ELEMENT FOR A POWER TRAIN, AND POWERTRAIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.04.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEW H POWERTRAIN HOLDING, S.L.U. Avenida de Madrid número 72 47008 Valladolid / ES | [2024/10] |
Former [2022/30] | For all designated states Renault s.a.s 122-122 bis avenue du Général Leclerc 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | ||
Former [2022/14] | For all designated states Renault s.a.s 13/15, quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHRISTOU, Panagiotis 78084 guyancourt / FR | 02 /
Millon, Jean-Pierre 78870 Bailly / FR | 03 /
POMMERY, William 95560 MONTSOULT / FR | [2022/14] | Representative(s) | Renault Group Renault s.a.s. 1 avenue du Golf FR TCR AVA 055 78084 Guyancourt Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2022/14] | Renault Group Renault s.a.s. API : TCR GRA 2 36 1, Avenue du Golf 78084 Guyancourt Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 21197884.6 | 21.09.2021 | [2022/14] | Priority number, date | FR20200010078 | 02.10.2020 Original published format: FR 2010078 | [2022/14] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3978285 | Date: | 06.04.2022 | Language: | FR | [2022/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B60K6/24, B60K6/46, B60W20/13, F02B75/04, F02D15/00, F02D15/02, B60L50/10 | [2022/14] | CPC: |
B60K6/24 (EP);
B60K6/46 (EP);
B60L3/0046 (EP);
B60L50/61 (EP);
B60L58/12 (EP);
B60W20/13 (EP);
F02B75/045 (EP);
F02D15/02 (EP);
F02D29/02 (EP);
B60W2510/085 (EP);
B60W2510/244 (EP);
B60W2710/06 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/19] |
Former [2022/14] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERWALTUNG EINES LADEZUSTANDS EINES ELEKTRISCHEN ENERGIESPEICHERELEMENTS EINER ANTRIEBSEINHEIT, SOWIE ANTRIEBSEINHEIT | [2022/14] | English: | METHOD FOR MANAGING A CHARGE LEVEL OF AN ELECTRICAL ENERGY STORAGE ELEMENT FOR A POWER TRAIN, AND POWERTRAIN | [2022/14] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE GESTION D'UN NIVEAU DE CHARGE D'UN ÉLÉMENT DE STOCKAGE D'ÉNERGIE ÉLECTRIQUE D'UN GROUPE MOTOPROPULSEUR, AINSI QUE GROUPE MOTOPROPULSEUR | [2022/14] | Examination procedure | 11.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/20] | 11.04.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1462637 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]); | [XI]DE102010024896 (MILLER PHILLIPP [DE], et al); | [A]EP3418532 (RENAULT SAS [FR]); | [XI]WO2020170634 (HITACHI AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS LTD [JP]) |