EP4002175 - SEAMLESS SMM GLOBAL DRIVER UPDATE BASE ON SMM ROOT-OF-TRUST [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.09.2024 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.12.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INTEL Corporation 2200 Mission College Blvd. Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2022/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JAYAKUMAR, Sarathy Portland, OR, 97229 / US | 02 /
JIEWEN, Yao Shanghai, 200135 / CN | 03 /
NACHIMUTHU, Murugasamy K. Beaverton, OR, 97007 / US | 04 /
LI, Ruixia Shanghai, 200240 / CN | 05 /
FU, Siyuan Shanghai, 200241 / CN | [2022/21] | Representative(s) | Rummler, Felix, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [2022/21] | Application number, filing date | 21197922.4 | 21.09.2021 | [2022/21] | Priority number, date | US202063116079P | 19.11.2020 Original published format: US 202063116079 P | US202017134329 | 26.12.2020 Original published format: US202017134329 | [2022/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4002175 | Date: | 25.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/57, G06F8/65 | [2022/21] | CPC: |
G06F21/572 (EP,US);
G06F8/65 (EP,CN);
G06F21/31 (US);
G06F21/575 (EP,US);
G06F21/79 (US);
G06F8/71 (CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/01] |
Former [2022/21] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NAHTLOSE GLOBALE SMM-TREIBERAKTUALISIERUNG BASIEREND AUF SMM-VERTRAUENSANKER | [2022/21] | English: | SEAMLESS SMM GLOBAL DRIVER UPDATE BASE ON SMM ROOT-OF-TRUST | [2022/21] | French: | BASE DE MISE À JOUR DE PILOTE GLOBAL SMM SANS INTERRUPTION SUR RACINE DE CONFIANCE SMM | [2022/21] | Examination procedure | 25.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/01] | 25.11.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.09.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2008270779 (WILSON MARK ERIC [US]); | [XI]US2013031538 (SKALSKY NATHAN C [US]); | [XI]US8468333 (NALLAGATLA PURANDHAR [US], et al); | [I]US2017242598 (NIJHAWAN VIJAY BHARAT [US], et al) |