EP3970674 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR FOLDING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.12.2023 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.12.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.09.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Curt G. Joa, Inc. 100 Crocker Avenue Sheboygan Falls Wisconsin 53085 / US | [2022/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NELSON, Brian Sheboygan Falls, 53085 / US | 02 /
MUHS, Thomas Kiel, 53042 / US | 03 /
FERGUSON, Ryan Howards Grove, 53083 / US | [2022/12] | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/12] | Potter Clarkson The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | Application number, filing date | 21198302.8 | 21.10.2015 | [2022/12] | Priority number, date | US201462068353P | 24.10.2014 Original published format: US 201462068353 P | [2022/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3970674 | Date: | 23.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3970674 | Date: | 01.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/15 | [2022/12] | CPC: |
A61F13/15747 (EP,US);
B31D1/00 (US);
A61F13/15764 (EP,US);
B31F1/0016 (US);
B31D1/0081 (US);
B31D2201/00 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/12] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM FALTEN | [2022/12] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR FOLDING | [2022/12] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE PLIAGE | [2022/12] | Examination procedure | 22.09.2021 | Examination requested [2022/12] | 25.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.09.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 21.12.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.12.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15853115.2 / EP3209587 | Opposition(s) | 03.11.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.02.2023 | CZ | 01.02.2023 | EE | 01.02.2023 | FI | 01.02.2023 | HR | 01.02.2023 | LT | 01.02.2023 | LV | 01.02.2023 | MC | 01.02.2023 | RO | 01.02.2023 | RS | 01.02.2023 | SI | 01.02.2023 | SK | 01.02.2023 | SM | 01.02.2023 | NO | 01.05.2023 | GR | 02.05.2023 | IS | 01.06.2023 | PT | 01.06.2023 | GB | 21.10.2023 | LU | 21.10.2023 | CH | 31.10.2023 | [2024/35] |
Former [2024/33] | AT | 01.02.2023 | |
CZ | 01.02.2023 | ||
EE | 01.02.2023 | ||
FI | 01.02.2023 | ||
HR | 01.02.2023 | ||
LT | 01.02.2023 | ||
LV | 01.02.2023 | ||
MC | 01.02.2023 | ||
RO | 01.02.2023 | ||
RS | 01.02.2023 | ||
SI | 01.02.2023 | ||
SK | 01.02.2023 | ||
SM | 01.02.2023 | ||
NO | 01.05.2023 | ||
GR | 02.05.2023 | ||
IS | 01.06.2023 | ||
PT | 01.06.2023 | ||
GB | 21.10.2023 | ||
LU | 21.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/30] | AT | 01.02.2023 | |
CZ | 01.02.2023 | ||
EE | 01.02.2023 | ||
FI | 01.02.2023 | ||
HR | 01.02.2023 | ||
LT | 01.02.2023 | ||
LV | 01.02.2023 | ||
MC | 01.02.2023 | ||
RO | 01.02.2023 | ||
RS | 01.02.2023 | ||
SI | 01.02.2023 | ||
SK | 01.02.2023 | ||
SM | 01.02.2023 | ||
NO | 01.05.2023 | ||
GR | 02.05.2023 | ||
IS | 01.06.2023 | ||
PT | 01.06.2023 | ||
LU | 21.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/28] | AT | 01.02.2023 | |
CZ | 01.02.2023 | ||
EE | 01.02.2023 | ||
FI | 01.02.2023 | ||
HR | 01.02.2023 | ||
LT | 01.02.2023 | ||
LV | 01.02.2023 | ||
MC | 01.02.2023 | ||
RO | 01.02.2023 | ||
RS | 01.02.2023 | ||
SI | 01.02.2023 | ||
SK | 01.02.2023 | ||
SM | 01.02.2023 | ||
NO | 01.05.2023 | ||
GR | 02.05.2023 | ||
IS | 01.06.2023 | ||
PT | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AT | 01.02.2023 | |
CZ | 01.02.2023 | ||
EE | 01.02.2023 | ||
FI | 01.02.2023 | ||
HR | 01.02.2023 | ||
LT | 01.02.2023 | ||
LV | 01.02.2023 | ||
RO | 01.02.2023 | ||
RS | 01.02.2023 | ||
SI | 01.02.2023 | ||
SK | 01.02.2023 | ||
SM | 01.02.2023 | ||
NO | 01.05.2023 | ||
GR | 02.05.2023 | ||
IS | 01.06.2023 | ||
PT | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 01.02.2023 | |
CZ | 01.02.2023 | ||
EE | 01.02.2023 | ||
FI | 01.02.2023 | ||
HR | 01.02.2023 | ||
LT | 01.02.2023 | ||
LV | 01.02.2023 | ||
RO | 01.02.2023 | ||
RS | 01.02.2023 | ||
SK | 01.02.2023 | ||
SM | 01.02.2023 | ||
NO | 01.05.2023 | ||
GR | 02.05.2023 | ||
IS | 01.06.2023 | ||
PT | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 01.02.2023 | |
CZ | 01.02.2023 | ||
EE | 01.02.2023 | ||
FI | 01.02.2023 | ||
HR | 01.02.2023 | ||
LT | 01.02.2023 | ||
LV | 01.02.2023 | ||
RO | 01.02.2023 | ||
RS | 01.02.2023 | ||
SM | 01.02.2023 | ||
NO | 01.05.2023 | ||
GR | 02.05.2023 | ||
IS | 01.06.2023 | ||
PT | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 01.02.2023 | |
EE | 01.02.2023 | ||
FI | 01.02.2023 | ||
HR | 01.02.2023 | ||
LT | 01.02.2023 | ||
LV | 01.02.2023 | ||
RS | 01.02.2023 | ||
SM | 01.02.2023 | ||
NO | 01.05.2023 | ||
GR | 02.05.2023 | ||
IS | 01.06.2023 | ||
PT | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | AT | 01.02.2023 | |
FI | 01.02.2023 | ||
HR | 01.02.2023 | ||
LT | 01.02.2023 | ||
LV | 01.02.2023 | ||
RS | 01.02.2023 | ||
SM | 01.02.2023 | ||
NO | 01.05.2023 | ||
GR | 02.05.2023 | ||
IS | 01.06.2023 | ||
PT | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AT | 01.02.2023 | |
FI | 01.02.2023 | ||
HR | 01.02.2023 | ||
LT | 01.02.2023 | ||
LV | 01.02.2023 | ||
RS | 01.02.2023 | ||
NO | 01.05.2023 | ||
GR | 02.05.2023 | ||
IS | 01.06.2023 | ||
PT | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AT | 01.02.2023 | |
FI | 01.02.2023 | ||
HR | 01.02.2023 | ||
LT | 01.02.2023 | ||
LV | 01.02.2023 | ||
RS | 01.02.2023 | ||
NO | 01.05.2023 | ||
GR | 02.05.2023 | ||
PT | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | AT | 01.02.2023 | |
FI | 01.02.2023 | ||
HR | 01.02.2023 | ||
LT | 01.02.2023 | ||
LV | 01.02.2023 | ||
RS | 01.02.2023 | ||
NO | 01.05.2023 | ||
PT | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 01.02.2023 | |
HR | 01.02.2023 | ||
LT | 01.02.2023 | ||
RS | 01.02.2023 | ||
NO | 01.05.2023 | ||
PT | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | LT | 01.02.2023 | |
RS | 01.02.2023 | ||
PT | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | LT | 01.02.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3076460 (HARRISON NORMAN A) [A] 5,9 * figure 3 *; | [A]US3116920 (GEER HENRY G, et al) [A] 5,9* figures 1,2,3 *; | [A]US2013130879 (SCHOON BRADLEY [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * figures 8,11-13 * * paragraphs [0057] - [0059] - [0063] - [0067] * |