EP3974573 - LAUNDRY TREATING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.09.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu SEOUL 07336 / KR | [2022/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JUNG, Sungwoon Seoul / KR | 02 /
SHIM, Hyehyun Seoul / KR | 03 /
JANG, Hunjun Seoul / KR | [2022/13] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstraße 3 81675 München / DE | [2022/13] | Application number, filing date | 21198488.5 | 23.09.2021 | [2022/13] | Priority number, date | KR20200124476 | 25.09.2020 Original published format: KR 20200124476 | [2022/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3974573 | Date: | 30.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | D06F39/02 | [2022/13] | CPC: |
D06F39/02 (EP,CN,US);
D06F39/022 (CN,KR);
D06F34/14 (CN);
D06F39/028 (US);
D06F58/20 (CN);
D06F21/04 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/44] |
Former [2022/13] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WÄSCHEBEHANDLUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2022/13] | English: | LAUNDRY TREATING APPARATUS | [2022/13] | French: | APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT DU LINGE | [2022/13] | Examination procedure | 23.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/13] | 27.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.09.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]KR100733307B ; | [XY]CN202744828U (NANJING LG PANDA APPLIANCES CO); | [XAI]CN105442266 (WUXI LITTLE SWAN CO LTD); | [XAY]US2018044840 (SONG WEON JIN [KR], et al); | [XAI]WO2019128725 (QINGDAO HAIER WASHING MACH CO [CN]); | [XA]US2019368110 (WANG HAIFENG [CN], et al); | [XI]US2020232145 (JUNG SUNGWOON [KR], et al) | by applicant | KR20200091245 |