EP3975165 - VGA CARD ASSEMBLY, MONITORING DEVICE THEREOF, AND IMAGE OUTPUT METHOD PERFORMED THEREBY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.07.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.12.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.06.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Giga-Byte Technology Co., Ltd. No. 6, Bau-Chiang Road Hsin-Tien Dist. New Taipei City / TW | [2022/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUANG, Shun-Chih New Taipei City / TW | 02 /
LU, Ching-Yu New Taipei City / TW | 03 /
WU, Liang Yu New Taipei City / TW | 04 /
LEE, Jeffrey New Taipei City / TW | 05 /
LI, Yen-Lin New Taipei City / TW | 06 /
YANG, Chieh-Hsi New Taipei City / TW | 07 /
LIN, HANCHAO New Taipei City / TW | [2022/13] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2022/13] | Application number, filing date | 21198801.9 | 24.09.2021 | [2022/13] | Priority number, date | TW20200133354 | 25.09.2020 Original published format: TW 109133354 | [2022/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3975165 | Date: | 30.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G09G5/00, G06F3/06, G09G5/36, G09G5/395, H04N21/426, G09G5/399, G06F3/147 | [2022/13] | CPC: |
H04N21/426 (EP);
G06T1/20 (US);
G06F11/3055 (US);
G06F3/061 (EP);
G06F3/064 (EP);
G06F3/0659 (EP);
G06F3/0679 (EP);
G06F3/147 (EP,US);
G06T1/60 (US);
G09G5/006 (EP);
G09G5/363 (EP);
G09G5/395 (EP);
G09G5/399 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/28] |
Former [2022/13] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VGA-KARTEN-ANORDNUNG, ÜBERWACHUNGSVORRICHTUNG DAFÜR UND DAMIT DURCHGEFÜHRTES BILDAUSGABEVERFAHREN | [2022/13] | English: | VGA CARD ASSEMBLY, MONITORING DEVICE THEREOF, AND IMAGE OUTPUT METHOD PERFORMED THEREBY | [2022/13] | French: | ENSEMBLE DE CARTES VGA, DISPOSITIF DE SURVEILLANCE ASSOCIÉ, ET PROCÉDÉ DE SORTIE D'IMAGE EFFECTUÉ À L'AIDE DE CELUI-CI | [2022/13] | Examination procedure | 02.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/28] | 02.06.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.04.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/35] | 03.05.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2005060122 (LIN YAO-NAN [TW], et al) [A] 1-9 * column 1, line 38 - column 4, line 40 * * figures 2-5 *; | [A]US2007139445 (KHAN MOINUL H [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0012] ** figure 2 *; | [A]WO2008119826 (TECHNOLOGY FROM IDEAS [IE], et al) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * page 3, line 1 - page 5, line 17 * * figure 3 *; | [I]US10401927 (HAN TAI-SHENG [TW]) [I] 1-9 * column 1, line 45 - column 4, line 23 * * figures 1-6 *; | [A]CN209401003U (BEIJING WATERTEK INFORMATION TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-9 * page 6, line 20 - line 25 * * figure 3 * |