EP4016349 - TECHNIQUES FOR TAMPER DETECTION AND PROTECTION OF A MEMORY MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.12.2022 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2022/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DATTA, Shamanna M. Hillsboro, 97124 / US | 02 /
ALTMAN, Asher M. Bedford, 01730 / US | 03 /
GROOMS, John K. Webster, 01570 / US | 04 /
ARAFA, Mohamed Chandler, 85226 / US | [2022/25] | Representative(s) | Rummler, Felix, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [2022/25] | Application number, filing date | 21198806.8 | 24.09.2021 | [2022/25] | Priority number, date | US202017123592 | 16.12.2020 Original published format: US202017123592 | [2022/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4016349 | Date: | 22.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/57, G06F21/79, G06F21/87, G11C16/22, G06K19/073 | [2022/25] | CPC: |
G11C16/22 (EP);
G11C29/54 (CN);
G06F21/87 (EP,US);
G06F12/1433 (US);
G06F21/575 (EP,US);
G06F21/64 (CN);
G06F21/79 (EP,US);
G11C11/4063 (CN);
G11C13/0004 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/02] |
Former [2022/25] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR MANIPULATIONSERKENNUNG UND ZUM SCHUTZ EINES SPEICHERMODULS | [2022/25] | English: | TECHNIQUES FOR TAMPER DETECTION AND PROTECTION OF A MEMORY MODULE | [2022/25] | French: | TECHNIQUES DE DÉTECTION ET DE PROTECTION CONTRE LE SABOTAGE D'UN MODULE DE MÉMOIRE | [2022/25] | Examination procedure | 07.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/02] | 07.12.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP1751798 (GORE W L & ASS UK [GB]) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0054]; claim 39 *; | [A]US2017094819 (BRODSKY WILLIAM L [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0091] *; | [A]US2019384942 (DRAGONE SILVIO [CH], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0068] * |