EP3955346 - SECONDARY BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.05.2022 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Murata Manufacturing Co., Ltd. 10-1, Higashikotari 1-chome Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto 617-8555 / JP | For all designated states HYDRO-QUEBEC 75, Boulevard René-Lévesque Ouest Montréal, Québec H2Z 1A4 / CA | [2022/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ASAKAWA, Yulchiro Fukushima, 9630531 / JP | 02 /
ZAGHIB, Karim Varennes, J3X 1S1 / CA | 03 /
UESAKA, Shinichi Fukushima, 9630531 / JP | 04 /
DAIGLE, Jean-Christophe Varennes, J3X 1S1 / CA | [2022/07] | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [2022/07] | Application number, filing date | 21198810.0 | 30.08.2017 | [2022/07] | Priority number, date | US201662438109P | 22.12.2016 Original published format: US 201662438109 P | US201715676493 | 14.08.2017 Original published format: US201715676493 | [2022/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3955346 | Date: | 16.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/485, H01M10/0525, H01M10/0567, B60L58/20 | [2022/07] | CPC: |
H01M10/0525 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/0567 (EP,KR,US);
B60L58/20 (EP,US);
H01M10/425 (US);
H01M4/485 (EP,KR,US);
B25F5/00 (US);
H01M2004/027 (US);
H01M2010/4271 (US);
H01M2220/10 (EP,KR);
H01M2220/20 (EP,KR,US);
H01M2220/30 (EP,KR);
H01M2300/0025 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/26] |
Former [2022/07] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE | [2022/07] | English: | SECONDARY BATTERY | [2022/07] | French: | BATTERIE SECONDAIRE | [2022/07] | Examination procedure | 19.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/26] | 19.05.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17771596.8 / EP3560013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]US2011311866 (LIM JIN-HYUNK [KR], et al) [I] 1,2,4-10 * paragraph [0007]; examples 1-3; claims 1,9; table 1 *[A] 3 | by applicant | WO2013058235 | WO2013168821 |