EP3985491 - CONTROL METHOD FOR TOUCHLESS GESTURE CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.10.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2023 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AMERIA AG Palo-Alto-Platz 1 69124 Heidelberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/16] | For all designated states ameria AG Palo-Alto-Platz 1 69124 Heidelberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEILER, Martin 69221 Dossenheim / DE | 02 /
HIXON, Dennis 69118 Heidelberg / DE | [2022/16] | Representative(s) | Best, Bastian Bestpatent Patentanwalt Bastian Best Konrad-Zuse-Platz 8 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/16] | Best, Bastian Bestpatent Teuchertstraße 2b 81829 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21198813.4 | 19.10.2020 | [2022/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3985491 | Date: | 20.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/042, G06F3/0484 | [2022/16] | CPC: |
G06F3/011 (EP);
G06F3/017 (EP);
G06F3/0418 (EP);
G06F3/0425 (EP);
G06F3/0484 (EP);
G06F2203/04101 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/46] |
Former [2022/16] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STEUERUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR BERÜHRUNGSLOSE GESTENSTEUERUNG | [2022/16] | English: | CONTROL METHOD FOR TOUCHLESS GESTURE CONTROL | [2022/16] | French: | MÉTHODE DE CONTRÔLE POUR LE CONTRÔLE DES GESTES SANS TOUCHE | [2022/16] | Examination procedure | 10.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.10.2022 | Examination requested [2022/46] | 10.10.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP20202580.5 / EP3985484 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2014201689 (BEDIKIAN RAFFI [US], et al) [X] 1,4-7 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0063]; figures 1A-1D, 8A-8B, 5A-6A * [I] 2,3; | [A]US2014201666 (BEDIKIAN RAFFI [US], et al) [A] 1,6,7 * paragraphs [0024] , [0 72] , [0 92]; figures 1A, 1B, 3A-6, 8A-10D ** paragraph [0076] - paragraph [0084] *; | [A]US10607413 (MARCOLINA ALEX [US], et al) [A] 1,6,7 * columns 4, 7, 8; figures 8, 20 * * columns 42, 43 * | by applicant | WO2015139969 | EP2849442 | EP3447610 |