EP3992203 - PLANT CYTOCHROME P450 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.10.2022 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sun Pharmaceutical Industries (Australia) Pty Limited Level 4 1 Acacia Place Notting Hill VIC 3168 / AU | [2022/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WINZER, Thilo YORK, YO105DD / GB | 02 /
GRAHAM, Ian YORK, YO105DD / GB | 03 /
WALKER, Tracey Beaumaris, 3193 / AU | [2022/18] | Representative(s) | Symbiosis IP Limited Innovation Centre Innovation Way Heslington, York YO10 5DG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/18] | Docherty, Robert Charles Symbiosis IP Limited York Biotech Campus Office 14FA05 Sand Hutton York, YO41 1LZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 21198845.6 | 18.07.2011 | [2022/18] | Priority number, date | GB20100021707 | 22.07.2010 Original published format: GB 201021707 | GB20100012262 | 22.12.2010 Original published format: GB 201012262 | [2022/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3992203 | Date: | 04.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/415, C12N15/82 | [2022/18] | CPC: |
C07K14/415 (EP,US);
C12N15/8251 (US);
A01H3/04 (US);
C12N15/67 (US);
C12N15/8218 (US);
C12N15/8243 (EP,US);
C12N7/00 (US);
C12N9/0071 (EP,US);
C12N9/0077 (EP,US);
C12P17/188 (US);
C12Q1/6876 (US);
C12Y114/00 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/47] |
Former [2022/18] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | PFLANZENCYTOCHROM P450 | [2022/18] | English: | PLANT CYTOCHROME P450 | [2022/18] | French: | CYTOCHROME P450 VÉGÉTAL | [2022/18] | Examination procedure | 17.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.10.2022 | Examination requested [2022/47] | 17.10.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP11748702.5 / EP2596012 | EP16186318.8 / EP3121193 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 29.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1632565 (JOHNSON & JOHNSON RES PTY LTD [AU]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [XD]WO2009064771 (UNIV NORTH CAROLINA STATE [US], et al) [XD] 1-8,11-16 * page 1, line 3 - line 7; claim -; sequence - *; | [XPY] - DESGAGNÉ-PENIX ISABEL ET AL, "Integration of deep transcriptome and proteome analyses reveals the components of alkaloid metabolism in opium poppy cell cultures", BMC PLANT BIOLOGY, BIOMED CENTRAL, LONDON, GB, (20101118), vol. 10, no. 1, doi:10.1186/1471-2229-10-252, ISSN 1471-2229, page 252, XP021086707 [XP] 1-8,11-16 * sequences GU325750, D3JXF8 * [Y] 9,10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1471-2229-10-252 | [ ] - "Papaver somniferum stylopine synthase mRNA, complete cds.", EMBL, (20100128), Database accession no. GU325750, URL: EBI [ ] * sequence . * | [ ] - "SubName: Full=Stylopine synthase;", UniProt, (20100323), Database accession no. D3JXF8, URL: EBI [ ] * sequence . * | [XY] - FRICK ET AL, "Metabolic engineering with a morphine biosynthetic P450 in opium poppy surpasses breeding", METABOLIC ENGINEERING, ACADEMIC PRESS, US, (20070216), vol. 9, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.YMBEN.2006.10.004, ISSN 1096-7176, pages 169 - 176, XP005888124 [X] 1-8,11-16 * page 170, column 2, paragraph 2 * * page 172, column 2, paragraph 2 * [Y] 9,10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ymben.2006.10.004 | [Y] - WESLEY S VARSHA ET AL, "Construct design for efficient, effective and high-throughput gene silencing in plants", THE PLANT JOURNAL, BLACKWELL SCIENTIFIC PUBLICATIONS, OXFORD, GB, (20010901), vol. 27, no. 6, doi:10.1046/J.1365-313X.2001.01105.X, ISSN 0960-7412, pages 581 - 590, XP002187670 [Y] 9,10 * page 582, column 2, paragraph 1 - page 586, column 2, paragraph 1; figures 3,5; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1365-313X.2001.01105.x | [A] - PETER J. FACCHINI ET AL, "Opium poppy and Madagascar periwinkle: model non-model systems to investigate alkaloid biosynthesis in plants", THE PLANT JOURNAL, (20080501), vol. 54, no. 4, doi:10.1111/j.1365-313X.2008.03438.x, ISSN 0960-7412, pages 763 - 784, XP055012554 [A] 1-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1365-313X.2008.03438.x | by applicant | EP0194809 | US5268463 | US5399680 | US5466785 | US5569597 | US5604121 | US5608149 | US5608144 | US5608142 | US5789156 | US5814618 | WO2008070274 | WO2008088161 | WO2008150473 | WO2009064771 | - KRUSE et al., Chemistry & Biology, (20080000), vol. 15, pages 149 - 156 | - IKEZAWA et al., Plant Cell Rep, (20090000), vol. 28, pages 123 - 133 | - RATCLIFF et al., Plant J, (20010000), vol. 25, no. 2, pages 237 - 245 | - OROZCO et al., Plant Mol. Biol., (19930000), vol. 23, no. 6, pages 1129 - 1138 | - ODELL et al., Nature, (19850000), vol. 313, pages 9810 - 812 | - MCELROY et al., Plant Cell, (19900000), vol. 2, pages 163 - 171 | - CHRISTIAN et al., Plant Mol. Biol., (19890000), vol. 18, pages 675 - 689 | - LAST et al., Theor Appl. Genet., (19910000), vol. 81, pages 581 - 588 | - VELTEN et al., EMBO J, (19840000), vol. 3, pages 2723 - 2730 | - SCHENA et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19910000), vol. 88, pages 10421 - 10425 | - MCNELLIS et al., Plant J, (19980000), vol. 14, no. 2, pages 247 - 257 | - GATZ et al., Mol. Gen. Genet., (19910000), vol. 227, pages 229 - 237 | - YAMAMOTO et al., Plant J, (19970000), vol. 12, no. 2, pages 255 - 265 | - KAWAMATA et al., Plant Cell Physiol, (19970000), vol. 38, no. 7, pages 792 - 803 | - HANSEN et al., Mol. Gen. Genet., (19970000), vol. 254, no. 3, pages 337 - 343 | - RUSSELL et al., Transgenic Res, (19970000), vol. 6, no. 2, pages 157 - 168 | - CANEVASCNI et al., Plant Physiol., (19960000), vol. 112, no. 2, pages 1331 - 1341 | - YAMAMOTO et al., Plant Cell Physiol., (19940000), vol. 35, no. 5, pages 773 - 778 | - LAM, Results Probl. Cell Differ., (19940000), vol. 20, pages 181 - 196 | - MUTSUOKA et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19930000), vol. 90, no. 20, pages 9586 - 9590 | - GUEVARA-GARCIA et al., Plant J, (19930000), vol. 4, no. 3, pages 495 - 50 | - "Plant transformation and expression vectors", GUERINEAUMULLINEAUX, Plant Molecular Biology Labfax, BIOS Scientific Publishers, (19930000), pages 121 - 148 | - ALTSCHUL et al., Nucleic Acids Res., (19970000), vol. 25, pages 3389 - 3402 | - CHANG et al., Plant Molecular Rep, (19930000), vol. 11, pages 113 - 116 | - MEYER et al., Nature Protocols, (20080000), vol. 3, pages 267 - 278 | - HUANGMADAN, Genome Research, (19990000), vol. 9, pages 868 - 877 | - LIU et al., Plant J, (20020000), vol. 30, no. 4, pages 415 - 429 | - "GenBank", Database accession no. AF406990 | - HILEMAN et al., Plant J, (20050000), vol. 44, no. 2, pages 334 - 341 | - HAGELFACCHINI, Nat. Chem. Biol., (20100000), vol. 6, pages 273 - 275 | - SARIYARPHILLIPSON, Phytochem., (19770000), vol. 16, pages 2009 - 2013 | - SARIYARSHAMMA, Phytochem., (19860000), vol. 25, pages 2403 - 2406 | - SARIYAR, Pure Appl. Chem., (20020000), vol. 74, pages 557 - 574 | US19950409297 |