EP3992775 - EVALUATION FUNCTION GENERATION PROGRAM, EVALUATION FUNCTION GENERATION METHOD, OPTIMIZATION METHOD, AND OPTIMIZATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.08.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.08.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, LU, PL | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2022/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takatsu, Motomu Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2022/18] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2022/18] | Application number, filing date | 21199092.4 | 27.09.2021 | [2022/18] | Priority number, date | JP20200182263 | 30.10.2020 Original published format: JP 2020182263 | [2022/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3992775 | Date: | 04.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3992775 | Date: | 06.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06F7/544 | [2022/18] | CPC: |
G06F7/544 (EP);
G06F17/15 (CN);
G06F30/20 (US);
G06N7/08 (US);
G06Q10/04 (CN);
G06F2111/04 (US);
G06F2111/08 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/38] |
Former [2022/18] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | PROGRAMM ZUR ERZEUGUNG EINER AUSWERTUNGSFUNKTION, VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG EINER AUSWERTUNGSFUNKTION, OPTIMIERUNGSVERFAHREN UND OPTIMIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2022/18] | English: | EVALUATION FUNCTION GENERATION PROGRAM, EVALUATION FUNCTION GENERATION METHOD, OPTIMIZATION METHOD, AND OPTIMIZATION DEVICE | [2022/18] | French: | PROGRAMME DE GÉNÉRATION DE FONCTION D'ÉVALUATION, PROCÉDÉ DE GÉNÉRATION DE FONCTION D'ÉVALUATION, PROCÉDÉ D'OPTIMISATION, ET DISPOSITIF D'OPTIMISATION | [2022/18] | Examination procedure | 11.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/38] | 11.08.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 02.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.09.2023 | CZ | 06.09.2023 | EE | 06.09.2023 | ES | 06.09.2023 | FI | 06.09.2023 | HR | 06.09.2023 | IT | 06.09.2023 | LT | 06.09.2023 | LV | 06.09.2023 | NL | 06.09.2023 | PL | 06.09.2023 | RO | 06.09.2023 | RS | 06.09.2023 | SE | 06.09.2023 | SK | 06.09.2023 | SM | 06.09.2023 | LU | 27.09.2023 | NO | 06.12.2023 | GR | 07.12.2023 | IS | 06.01.2024 | PT | 08.01.2024 | [2024/27] |
Former [2024/23] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/14] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 06.09.2023 | |
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2019164079 (GAMBETTA JAY M [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0098] *; | [IA]US2020302306 (MATSUO ATSUSHI [JP], et al) [I] 1,3-8 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0051] * [A] 2,9,10; | [A] - CHEN JIAYIN ET AL, "Generalized Simulated Annealing with Sequentially Modified Cost Function for Combinatorial optimization Problems", 2019 AUSTRALIAN & NEW ZEALAND CONTROL CONFERENCE (ANZCC), IEEE, (20191127), doi:10.1109/ANZCC47194.2019.8945670, pages 48 - 53, XP033683158 [A] 1-10 * sections I, IV * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ANZCC47194.2019.8945670 | by applicant | JP2003223322 |