EP4155459 - PAPER FOR FLOW WRAPPING PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.11.2023 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.09.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.04.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.12.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PL, PT, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Billerud Aktiebolag (publ) Box 703 169 27 Solna / SE | [2023/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GILLGREN, Thomas 703 57 Örebro / SE | 02 /
LARSSON, Johan 805 98 Gävle / SE | 03 /
PROSPER, Wouter 714 93 Kopparberg / SE | [2023/13] | Representative(s) | Kransell & Wennborg KB P.O. Box 27834 115 93 Stockholm / SE | [2023/13] | Application number, filing date | 21199210.2 | 27.09.2021 | [2023/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4155459 | Date: | 29.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4155459 | Date: | 20.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | D21H19/58, B65D65/42, D21H19/82, D21H27/10 | [2023/13] | CPC: |
D21H19/822 (EP);
B65D65/42 (EP);
D21H19/58 (EP);
D21H27/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/13] | Title | German: | PAPIER FÜR SCHLAUCHBEUTELVERPACKUNGSVERFAHREN | [2023/13] | English: | PAPER FOR FLOW WRAPPING PROCESS | [2023/13] | French: | PAPIER POUR UN PROCESSUS D'EMBALLAGE EN FLUX | [2023/13] | Miscellaneous | EPB 2023/14: Amended claims in accordance with Rule 137(2) EPC | Examination procedure | 24.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/13] | 24.10.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 22.12.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.08.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 11.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 10.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.12.2023 | CZ | 20.12.2023 | EE | 20.12.2023 | ES | 20.12.2023 | FI | 20.12.2023 | HR | 20.12.2023 | IT | 20.12.2023 | LT | 20.12.2023 | LV | 20.12.2023 | NL | 20.12.2023 | PL | 20.12.2023 | RO | 20.12.2023 | RS | 20.12.2023 | SE | 20.12.2023 | SK | 20.12.2023 | SM | 20.12.2023 | BG | 20.03.2024 | NO | 20.03.2024 | GR | 21.03.2024 | IS | 20.04.2024 | PT | 22.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 20.12.2023 | |
CZ | 20.12.2023 | ||
EE | 20.12.2023 | ||
ES | 20.12.2023 | ||
FI | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
LV | 20.12.2023 | ||
NL | 20.12.2023 | ||
RO | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
SM | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
IS | 20.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 20.12.2023 | |
FI | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
LV | 20.12.2023 | ||
NL | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
SM | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
IS | 20.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | ES | 20.12.2023 | |
FI | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
LV | 20.12.2023 | ||
NL | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
IS | 20.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/27] | ES | 20.12.2023 | |
FI | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
LV | 20.12.2023 | ||
NL | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | FI | 20.12.2023 | |
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 21.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2018058010 (MONGRAIN YVON [CA], et al); | [I]US2020149222 (PANG JIEBIN [US], et al) |