EP3954306 - ADJUNCT MATERIAL WITH MATING FEATURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.07.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.11.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.06.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ethicon LLC 475 Street C, Suite 401 Los Frailes Industrial Park 00969 Guaynabo / PR | [2022/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHELTON, IV Frederick E. Cincinnati, 45242 / US | 02 /
HARRIS, Jason L. Cincinnati, 45242 / US | 03 /
VENDELY, Michael J. Cincinnati, 45242 / US | [2022/07] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2022/07] | Application number, filing date | 21199474.4 | 16.02.2018 | [2022/07] | Priority number, date | US201715435997 | 17.02.2017 Original published format: US201715435997 | [2022/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3954306 | Date: | 16.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/072, A61B17/115, // A61B17/00 | [2022/07] | CPC: |
A61B17/07292 (EP,US);
A61B17/00491 (US);
A61B17/07207 (EP,US);
A61B17/1155 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00004 (US);
A61B2017/0023 (US);
A61B2017/0046 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00473 (US);
A61B2017/00477 (US);
A61B2017/00526 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00884 (US);
A61B2017/07257 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/30] |
Former [2022/07] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ERGÄNZUNGSMATERIAL MIT PAARUNGSFUNKTIONEN | [2022/07] | English: | ADJUNCT MATERIAL WITH MATING FEATURES | [2022/07] | French: | ADDITIF AYANT DES CARACTÉRISTIQUES D'ACCOUPLEMENT | [2022/07] | Examination procedure | 22.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/30] | 22.06.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/33] | 11.04.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2024/33] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP18157201.7 / EP3363386 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP1256317 (ETHICON ENDO SURGERY INC [US]) [X] 1,2,4-7 * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0041]; figures 6-11 * * paragraph [0016] * [A] 3,8; | [A]EP2008595 (TYCO HEALTHCARE [US]) [A] 1-8 * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0038]; figures 3D, 4 *; | [A]EP2462880 (TYCO HEALTHCARE [US]) [A] 1-8* figure 4 *; | [A]EP2586380 (COVIDIEN LP [US]) [A] 1-8 * paragraph [0060]; figure 2A *; | [A]EP3072457 (ETHICON ENDO SURGERY LLC [PR]) [A] 1-8 * paragraph [0083]; figure 24 * | by applicant | US7143925 | US7601118 | US8317070 | US8393514 | US2013221065 | US2013256377 | US2015134077 | US2015134076 | US2015133996 | US2015129634 | US2015133995 | US2015277471 | US2015272575 | US2015351758 | US9282962 | US2016089142 |