EP3984937 - ELEVATOR SYSTEM FLOOR HEIGHT MAPPING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.12.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.10.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Otis Elevator Company One Carrier Place Farmington, Connecticut 06032 / US | [2022/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Trcka, Nikola Farmington, 06032 / US | [2022/16] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2022/16] | Application number, filing date | 21199569.1 | 28.09.2021 | [2022/16] | Priority number, date | US202017070003 | 14.10.2020 Original published format: US202017070003 | [2022/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3984937 | Date: | 20.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B66B1/34 | [2022/16] | CPC: |
B66B1/3407 (EP);
B66B1/3492 (US);
B66B1/3415 (US);
B66B2201/212 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/47] |
Former [2022/16] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STOCKWERKSHÖHENABBILDUNG EINES AUFZUGSSYSTEMS | [2022/16] | English: | ELEVATOR SYSTEM FLOOR HEIGHT MAPPING | [2022/16] | French: | MAPPAGE DE LA HAUTEUR DE PLANCHER DE SYSTÈME D'ASCENSEUR | [2022/16] | Examination procedure | 20.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.10.2022 | Examination requested [2022/47] | 20.10.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.04.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2015065315 (OTIS ELEVATOR CO [US]) [X] 1,8,15 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0026] *[I] 2-7,9-14; | [XI]WO2016018948 (OTIS ELEVATOR CO [US]) [X] 1,8,15 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0042] * [I] 2-7,9-14; | [XI]WO2019141598 (INVENTIO AG [CH]) [X] 1-6,8-13,15 * page 16, line 26 - page 19, line 17 * [I] 7,14 |