EP4156182 - AUDIO DEVICE WITH DISTRACTOR ATTENUATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.10.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.02.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GN Audio A/S Lautrupbjerg 7 2750 Ballerup / DK | [2023/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ADESOKAN, Bolaji, James 2750 Ballerup / DK | 02 /
VON BÜLOW, Allan, Mejlgren 2750 Ballerup / DK | [2023/13] | Representative(s) | Aera A/S Niels Hemmingsens Gade 10, 5th Floor 1153 Copenhagen K / DK | [2023/13] | Application number, filing date | 21199647.5 | 28.09.2021 | [2023/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4156182 | Date: | 29.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G10L21/0208, G10L21/0216, H04R3/00 | [2023/13] | CPC: |
G10L21/0216 (EP);
G10L21/0208 (EP,US);
G10K11/16 (US);
G10L15/02 (US);
H04R3/005 (EP,US);
G10L2021/02087 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/45] |
Former [2023/13] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUDIOVORRICHTUNG MIT DISTRAKTORDÄMPFER | [2023/13] | English: | AUDIO DEVICE WITH DISTRACTOR ATTENUATOR | [2023/13] | French: | DISPOSITIF AUDIO AVEC ATTÉNUATEUR D'ÉCARTEUR | [2023/13] | Examination procedure | 29.09.2023 | Examination requested [2023/45] | 29.09.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.10.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 09.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 09.01.2024 | Request for further processing filed | 09.01.2024 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.01.2024 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2008317259 (ZHANG MING [US], et al) [X] 1-11,14 * figures 2-5,10 * * paragraphs [0035] - [0041] - [0 44] , [0 52] , [0 63] - [0068] - [0 71] - [0073] *; | [X] - LI JUNFENG ET AL, "Improved hybrid microphone array post-filter by integrating a robust speech absence probability estimator for speech enhancement", INTERSPEECH 2006, ISCA, doi:10.21437/Interspeech.2006-554, (20060917), pages 2130 - 2133, URL: https://www.isca-speech.org/archive_v0/archive_papers/interspeech_2006/i06_1035.pdf, XP055900353 [X] 1,12,13 * figure 2 * * section 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.21437/Interspeech.2006-554 | [X] - Krini Mohammed ET AL, "A Practical Beamformer-Postfilter System for Microphone Arrays on Seat Belts", (20161005), pages 327 - 331, URL: https://ieeexplore.ieee.org/stampPDF/getPDF.jsp?tp=&arnumber=7776201&ref=aHR0cHM6Ly9pZWVleHBsb3JlLmllZWUub3JnL2Fic3RyYWN0L2RvY3VtZW50Lzc3NzYyMDE=, (20220311), XP055900347 [X] 1,15,16 * figure 3 * * section 3 * |